Capital Funding, LLC v. Maison De'Ville Nursing Home of Harvey, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Capital Funding, LLC
Defendant: Maison De'Ville Nursing Home of Harvey, LLC and Bobby G Dean, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03182
Filed: December 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Julie Rebecca Rubin
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Judgment by Capital Funding, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perrell, Joel)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER re ECF #9 : The parties may file the proposed motion for entry of consent judgment. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 2/1/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2023 Filing 9 Correspondence re: REQUEST TO FILE PROPOSED UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT (Perrell, Joel)
January 4, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Capital Funding, LLC. Maison De'Ville Nursing Home of Harvey, LLC waiver sent on 1/3/2023, answer due 3/6/2023.(Perrell, Joel)
January 4, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Capital Funding, LLC. Bobby G Dean, Jr waiver sent on 1/3/2023, answer due 3/6/2023.(Perrell, Joel)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 12/12/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2022 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Capital Funding, LLC identifying Other Affiliate CFG Bank for Capital Funding, LLC.(Perrell, Joel)
December 9, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bobby G Dean, Jr, Maison De'Ville Nursing Home of Harvey, LLC. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Capital Funding, LLC re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Perrell, Joel)
December 9, 2022 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Capital Funding, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10316544.), filed by Capital Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Perrell, Joel)
December 9, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2022 Deficiency Notice for Capital Funding, LLC-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/16/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Funding, LLC v. Maison De'Ville Nursing Home of Harvey, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Funding, LLC
Represented By: Joel Larkin Perrell, Jr
Represented By: Joel L Perrell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maison De'Ville Nursing Home of Harvey, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby G Dean, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?