Davis v. Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Danielle A Davis and Danielle Davis
Defendant: Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00028
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 ad Job Discrimination (Disability Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 2/15/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent/declination forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2023 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR)Consent to Magistrate Judge (Roussillon, Derek) Modified on 2/14/2023 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk).
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 1/30/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC or counsel for Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/13/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC(Roussillon, Derek)
January 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek P Roussillon on behalf of Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC (Roussillon, Derek)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 1/10/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Danielle Davis or counsel for Danielle Davis are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/24/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10359972.), filed by Danielle A Davis. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Fed. Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Smith, Christopher) Modified on 1/10/2023 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle A Davis
Represented By: Christopher J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Davis
Represented By: Christopher J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Properties Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Derek P Roussillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?