Gladhill v. Washington County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S Gladhill
Defendant: Washington County Board of Education, David T Sovine, Melissa A Williams, Theresa L Baker and Jennifer Webster
Case Number: 1:2023cv00098
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 dp Civil Right Denial of Due Process
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey S Gladhill. (Attachments: #1 Red Line Amended Complaint)(Dolina, Thomas)
February 23, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Theresa L Baker, David T Sovine, Washington County Board of Education, Jennifer Webster, Melissa A Williams (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brousaides, Eric)
February 23, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig S Meuser on behalf of All Defendants (Meuser, Craig)
February 21, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Theresa L Baker, David T Sovine, Washington County Board of Education, Jennifer Webster, Melissa A Williams (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Attachment #1, #3 Attachment Attachment #2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Brousaides, Eric)
February 21, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Charles Brousaides on behalf of All Defendants (Brousaides, Eric)
January 31, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey S Gladhill. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Service of Process, #2 Service of Process, #3 Service of Process, #4 Service of Process)(Dolina, Thomas)
January 25, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Theresa L Baker, David T Sovine, Washington County Board of Education, Jennifer Webster, Melissa A Williams.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jeffrey S Gladhill re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Dolina, Thomas)
January 17, 2023 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Jeffrey S Gladhill was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summonses for the 5 defendants. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summonses for the 5 defendants using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summonses for the 5 defendants to #1 Complaint. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10373743.), filed by Jeffrey S Gladhill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolina, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gladhill v. Washington County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S Gladhill
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Dolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Board of Education
Represented By: Eric Charles Brousaides
Represented By: Craig S Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David T Sovine
Represented By: Craig S Meuser
Represented By: Eric Charles Brousaides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa A Williams
Represented By: Craig S Meuser
Represented By: Eric Charles Brousaides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa L Baker
Represented By: Craig S Meuser
Represented By: Eric Charles Brousaides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Webster
Represented By: Craig S Meuser
Represented By: Eric Charles Brousaides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?