Securities and Exchange Commission v. Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Microbilt Corporation, Philip N. Burgess, Jr., Walter Wojciechowski and John Cook, Jr.
Interested Party: JOE KENARY
Case Number: 1:2023cv00841
Filed: March 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Referring Judge: Julie Rebecca Rubin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO REPLY TO RESPONSE OF JOSEPH KENARY TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD PARTY DOCUMENT SUBPOENA by Philip N. Burgess, Jr., John Cook, Jr., Microbilt Corporation, Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Walter Wojciechowski(Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Jacobovitz on behalf of Philip N. Burgess, Jr., John Cook, Jr., Microbilt Corporation, Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Walter Wojciechowski (Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2023 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by JOE KENARY.(Magid, Creighton)
April 6, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 MOTION to Compel Certificate of Service of the Motion to Compel by Philip N. Burgess, Jr., John Cook, Jr., Microbilt Corporation, Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Walter Wojciechowski(Lowman, Michael)
April 4, 2023 Filing 3 QC NOTICE PER BPG CHAMBERS: #1 Motion to Compel, filed by John Cook, Jr., Philip N. Burgess, Jr., Walter Wojciechowski, Microbilt Corporation, Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC was filed incompletely. ** The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Certificate of Service was not provided with the Motion to Compel on Joseph Kenary. To correct this problem, please file proof that Joseph Kenary has received the documents filed. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for Discovery, specifically ECF #1 , Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 4/4/2023. (kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/4/2023 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
March 28, 2023 Filing 1 Defendants' MOTION to Compel Compliance of Joseph Kenary with Third Party Document Subpoena by Philip N. Burgess, Jr., John Cook, Jr., Microbilt Corporation, Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Walter Wojciechowski (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Notice of Motion, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Complaint, #5 Subpoena, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2023 Filing fee: $ 49.00, receipt number 3877. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC
Represented By: Michael K Lowman
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microbilt Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobovitz
Represented By: Michael K Lowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip N. Burgess, Jr.
Represented By: Michael K Lowman
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Wojciechowski
Represented By: Michael K Lowman
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cook, Jr.
Represented By: Michael K Lowman
Represented By: Jeffrey S Jacobovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOE KENARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?