Pandora Franchising, LLC et al v. Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC and Pandora Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc., Maurice's Jewelers, Inc., Forensa, LLC and Andrew Koppel
Case Number: 1:2023cv01287
Filed: May 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/28/2023. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Forensa, LLC, Andrew Koppel, Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc., Maurice's Jewelers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Redd, Justin)
June 21, 2023 Filing 22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Forensa, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc., Other Affiliate Maurice's Jewelers, Inc. for Forensa, LLC.(Redd, Justin)
June 21, 2023 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Forensa, LLC, Other Affiliate Maurice's Jewelers, Inc. for Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc..(Redd, Justin)
June 21, 2023 Filing 20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Maurice's Jewelers, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Forensa, LLC, Other Affiliate Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc. for Maurice's Jewelers, Inc..(Redd, Justin)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/14/2023. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Forensa, LLC, Andrew Koppel, Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc., Maurice's Jewelers, Inc. or counsel for Forensa, LLC, Andrew Koppel, Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc., Maurice's Jewelers, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/21/2023. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/7/2023. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Forensa, LLC, Andrew Koppel, Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc., Maurice's Jewelers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Redd, Justin)
May 24, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Ventures, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC. Maurice's Jewelers, Inc. served on 5/17/2023, answer due 6/7/2023.(Fischman, Noam)
May 24, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Ventures, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC. Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc. served on 5/17/2023, answer due 6/7/2023.(Fischman, Noam)
May 24, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Ventures, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC. Forensa, LLC served on 5/17/2023, answer due 6/7/2023.(Fischman, Noam)
May 24, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Ventures, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC. Andrew Koppel served on 5/17/2023, answer due 6/7/2023.(Fischman, Noam)
May 17, 2023 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Riya Resheidat. Directing attorney Riya Resheidat to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 5/17/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2023 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sara A. Brubaker. Directing attorney Sara A. Brubaker to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 5/17/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 5/16/2023. (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC, Pandora Ventures, LLC or counsel for Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC, Pandora Ventures, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/30/2023. (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Forensa, LLC, Andrew Koppel, Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc., Maurice's Jewelers, Inc..(av4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Riya Resheidat (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10602360.) by Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC, Pandora Ventures, LLC(Fischman, Noam)
May 16, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sara A. Brubaker (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10602351.) by Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC, Pandora Ventures, LLC(Fischman, Noam)
May 16, 2023 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC, Pandora Ventures, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Pandora Jewelry, Inc. for Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC, Pandora Ventures, LLC.(Fischman, Noam)
May 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10602257.), filed by Pandora Franchising, LLC, Pandora Ventures, LLC, Pandora Jewelry LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement and Release of Claims Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit D - Termination Notice, #5 Exhibit E - Koppel Email, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Andrew Koppell, #8 Summons Forensa, LLC, #9 Summons Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc., #10 Summons Maurice's Jewelers, Inc.)(Fischman, Noam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pandora Franchising, LLC et al v. Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pandora Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Sara A. Brubaker
Represented By: Noam B Fischman
Represented By: Riya Resheidat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pandora Jewelry LLC
Represented By: Riya Resheidat
Represented By: Sara A. Brubaker
Represented By: Noam B Fischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pandora Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Noam B Fischman
Represented By: Sara A. Brubaker
Represented By: Riya Resheidat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice's Jewelers II, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Akihiko Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice's Jewelers, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Akihiko Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forensa, LLC
Represented By: Justin Akihiko Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Koppel
Represented By: Justin Akihiko Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?