K&S Capital, LLC et al v. Polo International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: K&S Capital, LLC and K&S Longmeadow, LLC
Defendant: Polo International, Inc. and Volatile Free, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01971
Filed: July 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Julie Rebecca Rubin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2023 Filing 11 Correspondence re: remand letter to State Court. (c/m 8/1/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court; remanding this case to the Circuit Court for Washington County, Maryland; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 8/1/2023. (c/m 8/1/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2023 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Volatile Free, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greivell, Adam)
July 25, 2023 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Timothy J. Andringa. Directing attorney Timothy J. Andringa to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 7/25/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2023 Filing 7 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy J. Andringa by Volatile Free, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Greivell, Adam)
July 24, 2023 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2023 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Volatile Free, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy J. Andringa (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10721991.) by Volatile Free, Inc.(Greivell, Adam)
July 21, 2023 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Polo International, Inc., Volatile Free, Inc., filed by K&S Longmeadow, LLC, K&S Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2023 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR WASHINGTON COUNTY, MARYLAND. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2023 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Volatile Free, Inc. (Greivell, Adam)
July 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Washington County, Maryland, case number C-21-CV-23-000306. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10721649), filed by Volatile Free, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (State Summons Complaint), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (State Court Docket Entries), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Greivell, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K&S Capital, LLC et al v. Polo International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K&S Capital, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M Wood, IV
Represented By: Roger Schlossberg
Represented By: Frank J Mastro
Represented By: Steven Jay Willner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K&S Longmeadow, LLC
Represented By: Frank J Mastro
Represented By: Roger Schlossberg
Represented By: Steven Jay Willner
Represented By: Thomas M Wood, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polo International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volatile Free, Inc.
Represented By: Adam D Greivell
Represented By: Timothy J. Andringa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?