Bernard v. Rideout
Plaintiff: Edward Bernard
Defendant: Jacob Rideout
Case Number: 1:2023cv02235
Filed: August 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen Lipton Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative for summary judgment. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 10/3/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheridan Todd Yeary on behalf of Edward Bernard (Yeary, Sheridan)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, 8 QC Notice - Miscellaneous, by Edward Bernard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Francis-Williams, Latoya)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, 8 QC Notice - Miscellaneous, by Edward Bernard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Francis-Williams, Latoya)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant's #9 Motion for Leave to File Electronic Documents in Physical Format; directing the DVD submitted as Exhibits B, C, E and H to Defendant's #7 Motion is accepted by the court. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 9/18/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Electronic Documents DVDs in Physical Format by Jacob Rideout (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levitan, Ronald)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Jacob Rideout contains place-holders for media exhibits. **Leave of Court is required to file any exhibit in physical format . Please file a motion for leave to file. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Jacob Rideout (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit Ex. A Rideout's Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. B Placeholder for Capranica's Car video, #5 Exhibit Ex. C Placeholder for Rideout's 1st In car video, #6 Exhibit Ex. D Emergency Services Report, #7 Exhibit Ex. E Placeholder for Rideout's Video 2 in car camera, #8 Exhibit Ex. F Photos of Plaintiff, #9 Exhibit Ex. G Court Records, #10 Exhibit Placeholder Audio Bernard's Testimony in State v. Bernard, #11 Exhibit Ex. I Petition for Emergency Evaluation of Bernard)(Levitan, Ronald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2023: #12 copy of cover letter for filed Separately Exhibits) (Filed Separately Exhibits consisting of 4 DVD's re: Exhibits B, C, E, and H received 9/21/23 and filed in the Clerk's Office Records Dept.) Modified on 9/22/2023 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Correspondence re: Statement of Defendant (Hott, Amy)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Filing fee paid: $ 402.00, receipt number 5629. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jacob Rideout (Hott, Amy)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jacob Rideout, filed by Edward Bernard. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (originally filed 8/16/23)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order The case of Bernard v. Rideout, has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is 1:23-cv-02235. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (2) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPER FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CAROLINE COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Caroline County Circuit Court, case number C-05-CV-23-000063., filed by Jacob Rideout. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter Cover letter, #3 Attachment Complaint Exhibit 2, #4 Attachment Docket entries Exhibit 1)(Hott, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernard v. Rideout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Bernard
Represented By: Sheridan Todd Yeary
Represented By: Latoya Andrea Francis-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Rideout
Represented By: Ronald M Levitan
Represented By: Amy E Hott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?