Booze v. State of Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Gordon E. Booze, IV
Defendant: State of Maryland and Baltimore Central Booking Intake Center
Case Number: 1:2023cv02248
Filed: August 16, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Lydia Kay Griggsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint as directed within 28 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 10/10/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(copy of order, complaint and civil rights forms mailed 10.10.2023)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 New Case Notification Letter sent to Gordon E. Booze, IV. (c/m 8/17/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 -[FILED IN ERROR, wrong address]- New Case Notification Letter sent to Gordon E. Booze, IV. (c/m 8/17/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/17/2023 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gordon E. Booze, IV(bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baltimore Central Booking Intake Center, State of Maryland, filed by Gordon E. Booze, IV. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booze v. State of Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon E. Booze, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Central Booking Intake Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?