Exum v. L.T. Donna et al
Plaintiff: Eric Exum and Eric Ricardo Exum
Defendant: L.T. Donna, Sgt. Jordan, CO. 2 Curtis, Capt. Venebale and Warden Robert Dean
Case Number: 1:2023cv02888
Filed: October 23, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Julie Rebecca Rubin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Order Directing the Finance Officer at JCI to FILE an inmate account summary information sheet for the past six months of Plaintiffs incarceration. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 12/15/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m to plaintiff & Finance Officer at JCI 12.15.23)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eric Ricardo Exum(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eric Ricardo Exum(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Ricardo Exum (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CO. 2 Curtis, Capt. Venebale, L.T. Donna, Sgt. Jordan, Warden Robert Dean, filed by Eric Ricardo Exum. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Envelope)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING Exum leave to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 11/15/2023. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(copy of order,the original Complaint and a blank civil rights complaint form 11.16.23)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 New Case Notification Letter sent to Eric Exum. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 10.26.23)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Eric Exum (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Exum(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CO. 2 Curtis, Capt. Venebale, L.T. Donna, Sgt. Jordan, filed by Eric Exum. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exum v. L.T. Donna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Exum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ricardo Exum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.T. Donna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO. 2 Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Venebale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Robert Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?