Dixon et al v. Blibaum and Associates, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Dixon and Shaul Dixon
Defendant: Blibaum and Associates, P.A. and Hendersen-Webb, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00029
Filed: January 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Erin Aslan
Referring Judge: Julie Rebecca Rubin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Case Reassigned to Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin. Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan no longer assigned to the case. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 1/5/2024. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan. Danielle Dixon, Shaul Dixon or counsel for Danielle Dixon, Shaul Dixon are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/19/2024. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Blibaum and Associates, P.A., Hendersen-Webb, Inc..(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11016888.), filed by Shaul Dixon, Danielle Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Mack, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon et al v. Blibaum and Associates, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Dixon
Represented By: Ingmar Bancroft Goldson
Represented By: Joseph Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaul Dixon
Represented By: Joseph Mack
Represented By: Ingmar Bancroft Goldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blibaum and Associates, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendersen-Webb, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?