Falcone v. Sehlke
Plaintiff: Michelle Falcone
Defendant: Chad Sehlke
Petitioner: Lucjan Haber and Melissa Haber
Case Number: 1:2024cv00262
Filed: January 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MARGINAL ORDER #10 NOTICE; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/1/2024. (ah8s, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE by Michelle Falcone re #1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas / Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of her Motion to Compel Discovery (Trice, D.)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Defendants' #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/22/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2024 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas by Lucjan Haber, Melissa Haber (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenville, Annie)
February 21, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Annie M Kenville on behalf of Lucjan Haber, Melissa Haber (Kenville, Annie)
February 5, 2024 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katherine Epstein. Directing attorney Katherine Epstein to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2024 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of D. Brandon Trice. Directing attorney D. Brandon Trice to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 2, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine Epstein (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11067582.) by Michelle Falcone(Clattenburg, Rachel)
February 2, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for D. Brandon Trice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11067558.) by Michelle Falcone(Clattenburg, Rachel)
January 30, 2024 Filing fee: $ 52.00, receipt number 7419 (ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. Clattenburg on behalf of Michelle Falcone (Clattenburg, Rachel)
January 26, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas by Michelle Falcone (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Text of Proposed Order, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clattenburg, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falcone v. Sehlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lucjan Haber
Represented By: Annie M Kenville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melissa Haber
Represented By: Annie M Kenville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Falcone
Represented By: Rachel M. Clattenburg
Represented By: D. Brandon Trice
Represented By: Katherine Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Sehlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?