Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: XUE LEE, BRENDA INDAH CHUNGA, SAM LEE, Bitcoin Beautee and Xue Samuel Lee
Case Number: 1:2024cv00296
Filed: January 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan Paul Van Hoven terminated. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/23/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brenda Indah Chunga (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Hoven, Jonathan)
February 23, 2024 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua Sabert Lowther. Directing attorney Joshua Sabert Lowther to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 2/23/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Lowther (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11102700.) by Brenda Indah Chunga(Elefant, Carolyn)
February 12, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Bockin on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Bockin, Gregory)
February 1, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Paul Van Hoven on behalf of Brenda Indah Chunga (Van Hoven, Jonathan)
January 31, 2024 Filing 3 JUDGMENT in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Brenda Indah Chunga. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/31/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2024 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Other Relief Entry of Partial Judgment Against Defendant Brenda Indah Chunga by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mihok, Judson) Modified on 1/31/2024 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
January 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XUE LEE, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mihok, Judson)
January 29, 2024 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Chief Judge James K. Bredar no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XUE LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDA INDAH CHUNGA
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Van Hoven
Represented By: Joshua Sabert Lowther
Represented By: Carolyn Elefant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitcoin Beautee
Represented By: Carolyn Elefant
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Van Hoven
Represented By: Joshua Sabert Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xue Samuel Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Judson Thomas Mihok
Represented By: Gregory Bockin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?