Jones v. Queen Anne's County, Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Donald Jones
Defendant: Queen Anne's County, Maryland, Warden/Director Lamonte Cooke, Sgt. Daniel Andrew, Sgt. Heather Edwards, Officer Christopher Barnett, Officer Carla Patterson, Officer Linda Roark, Officer Larry E. Hinch and Officer Travis Horney
Case Number: 1:2024cv01333
Filed: May 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Julie Rebecca Rubin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Jones. Christopher Barnett served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024; Lamonte Cooke served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024; Heather Edwards served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024; Larry E. Hinch served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024; Travis Horney served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024; Queen Anne's County, Maryland served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024; Linda Roark served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit)(Greenberg, Lawrence)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #3 Affidavit of Service, filed by Donald Jones was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Please refile using Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 -FILED IN ERROR- AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, CCS, DFJT served on Jamie Middleton, authorized agent of the Queen Annes County Detention Center on 06/17/2024, filed by Donald Jones. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit)(Greenberg, Lawrence) Modified on 6/27/2024 (ols, Deputy Clerk).
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Daniel Andrew, Christopher Barnett, Lamonte Cooke, Heather Edwards, Larry E. Hinch, Travis Horney, Carla Patterson, Queen Anne's County, Maryland, Linda Roark. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11247189.), filed by Donald Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Greenberg, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Queen Anne's County, Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Jones
Represented By: Lawrence S Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen Anne's County, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden/Director Lamonte Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Daniel Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Heather Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Christopher Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Carla Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Linda Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Larry E. Hinch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Travis Horney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?