Portillo et al v. Second Chance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Portillo and Francis Betancourth
Defendant: Second Chance, Inc., Mark Stephen Foster, 300 Painting & Remodeling LLC and Jose Javier Rivas Mendez
Case Number: 1:2024cv02660
Filed: September 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sam Williamson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Williamson, Sam)
October 31, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Marie Duckett-Oliver on behalf of Mark Stephen Foster, Second Chance, Inc. (Duckett-Oliver, Tyler)
October 31, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzzanne W Decker on behalf of Mark Stephen Foster, Second Chance, Inc. (Decker, Suzzanne)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David J Rodwin terminated. Signed by Chief Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/30/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - David Rodwin by Francis Betancourth, Manuel Portillo (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodwin, David)
October 4, 2024 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francis Betancourth, Manuel Portillo. Mark Stephen Foster waiver sent on 9/27/2024, answer due 11/26/2024.(Abrahamson, Sally)
October 4, 2024 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Francis Betancourth, Manuel Portillo. Second Chance, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2024, answer due 11/26/2024.(Abrahamson, Sally)
September 17, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to 300 Painting & Remodeling LLC, Mark Stephen Foster, Jose Javier Rivas Mendez, Second Chance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Mark Foster, #2 Summons 300 Painting & Remodeling LLC, #3 Summons Jose Javier Rivas Mendez)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Collective and Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11488608.), filed by Francis Betancourth, Manuel Portillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opt In Forms, #2 Exhibit 2 - Employment Opportunities, #3 Exhibit 3 - Decon. Worker Job Description, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Second Chance, Inc., #6 Summons Mark Foster, #7 Summons 300 Painting & Remodeling LLC, #8 Summons Jose Rivas Mendez)(Gellatly, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portillo et al v. Second Chance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Chance, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Marie Duckett-Oliver
Represented By: Suzzanne W Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stephen Foster
Represented By: Tyler Marie Duckett-Oliver
Represented By: Suzzanne W Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 300 Painting & Remodeling LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Javier Rivas Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Portillo
Represented By: Amy Gellatly
Represented By: Sally Jasmine Abrahamson
Represented By: Sam Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Betancourth
Represented By: Amy Gellatly
Represented By: Sally Jasmine Abrahamson
Represented By: Sam Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?