Legesse v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Yohannes B. Legesse
Defendant: Antonio Donis, Ur M. Jaddou, Merrick B. Garland and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 1:2024cv02909
Filed: October 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Maddox
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2024 Filing 5 PROOF of Service of Summons sent to Antonio Donis, Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Yohannes B. Legesse. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to Antonio Donis, Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (c/m p 11/12/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk take all necessary steps to issue summons and to return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 11/12/2024. (c/m p 11/12/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2024 Filing 2 New Case Notification Letter sent to Yohannes B. Legesse. (c/m 10/8/2024-sls) (slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antonio Donis, Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 2339.), filed by Yohannes B. Legesse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legesse v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Donis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yohannes B. Legesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?