Rich v. United States of America
Petitioner: Darelle Rich
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2024cv03106
Filed: October 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: Motion for Return of Property
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING Finance Officer to file an inmate account summary information sheet and certificate for the past six months within 21 days. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/11/2024. (c/m:Plaintiff & Finance Officer) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darelle Rich. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2024 Filing 4 Correspondence re: Summary of Case by Darelle Rich. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING Rich to either pay the $405.00 civil filing fee or file an indigency motion within 21 days from the entry date of this Order; GRANTING the Government 60 days from the date of this Order to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/13/2024. (c/m/w/encosure:petitioner) (c/em/w/enclosure:AUSA) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/13/2024 (hmls).
October 28, 2024 Filing 2 New Case Notification Letter sent to Darelle Rich. (Deputy Clerk) (c/m 10/28/24)
October 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Return of Property against United States of America, filed by Darelle Rich. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/nef to staff attys)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darelle Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?