Yoon v. Leavitt
Plaintiff: Sook Yoon
Defendant: Michael Leavitt
Case Number: 8:2008cv03173
Filed: November 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Alexander Williams
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 11/1/2010. (ns, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 LETTER/ORDER DENYING 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 7/9/2010. (kn, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 01/13/2010. (elts, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoon v. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sook Yoon
Represented By: Charles W Day, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?