Metropolitan Regional Information Systems, Inc. v. American Home Realty Network, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Metropolitan Regional Information Systems, Inc.
Defendant: American Home Realty Network, Inc. and Jonathan J. Cardella
Case Number: 8:2012cv00954
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Alexander Williams
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 150 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 92 MOTION for Contempt filed by Metropolitan Regional Information Systems, Inc., 113 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by American Home Realty Network, Inc. Signed by: Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze. Objections to R&R due by 6/21/2013. Responses due by 6/21/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze on 6/4/2013. (nss, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2013 159 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 6/10/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2013 175 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze on 7/5/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2013 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 7/31/2013. (nss, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2013 186 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 7/31/2013. (nss, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2013 239 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 11/1/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2013 270 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 12/3/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2013 289 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze on 12/20/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
December 30, 2013 295 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 12/30/2013. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 8/24/2012. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2015 434 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/17/2015. (sat, Chambers)
November 13, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 11/13/2012. (rss, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Regional Information Systems, Inc. v. American Home Realty Network, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Regional Information Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney Devin Cooke
Represented By: Margaret Aldona Esquenet
Represented By: John T Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Realty Network, Inc.
Represented By: L Peter Farkas
Represented By: Richard S Toikka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan J. Cardella
Represented By: Richard S Toikka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.