Donnelly et al v. Branch Banking and Trust Company

Plaintiff: V. Charles Donnelly and Deborah A. Steffen
Defendant: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Case Number: 8:2013cv00852
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Calvert
Presiding Judge: Alexander Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Denying 93 Plaintiff's Motion for a Continuance of Trial; Denying 86 Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate Their Negligence Claim. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/28/2016. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 3, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/3/2015. (c/m 3/3/15 jf2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 9/19/2013. (c/m 9/19/2013 eb)(ebs2, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 6/19/2013. (c/m 6/19/2013 eb)(ebs2, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donnelly et al v. Branch Banking and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. Charles Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: John Jun Young Lee
Represented By: Brian L Moffet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?