Innes et al v. The Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Innes and Sean Markel
Defendant: The Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, University of Maryland, College Park and Wallace D. Loh
Case Number: 8:2013cv02800
Filed: September 24, 2013
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Prince George's
Presiding Judge: Deborah K. Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/6/2015. (sat, Chambers)
March 16, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/16/2015. (sat, Chambers)
July 1, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/1/14. (sat, Chambers)
May 29, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/29/14. (sat, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innes et al v. The Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Innes
Represented By: Joseph B Espo(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Caroline Jackson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Brooke E Lierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Markel
Represented By: Joseph B Espo(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Caroline Jackson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Brooke E Lierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland, College Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace D. Loh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?