Turner v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Michelle A. Turner
Case Number: 8:2014cv00576
Filed: February 27, 2014
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/3/14. (c/m 4/4/14 mps, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/23/14. (c/m 4/23/14 cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/12/14. (c/m 5/12/14 mps, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/25/2014. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 9/25/14)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John S Simcox(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Chad King(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle A. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.