Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al v. Burwell et al
Plaintiff: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Otsuka Pharmaceutical Development & Commercialization, Inc.
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell, U.S. Food and Drug Administration and Dr. Margaret Hamburg or Dr. Stephen Ostroff
Intervenor_defendant: Apotex Inc., Apotex Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Alembic Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Intervenor_plaintiff: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 8:2015cv00852
Filed: March 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/27/2015. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying re 77 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Alembic Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Apotex Corporation, Apotex Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 4/29/2015. (am2s, Chambers)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 4/8/2015. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al v. Burwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Maggie Grace
Represented By: Ralph S Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Maggie Grace
Represented By: Ralph S Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Development & Commercialization, Inc.
Represented By: Maggie Grace
Represented By: Ralph S Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Represented By: Roger Joseph Gural
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Roger Joseph Gural
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Margaret Hamburg or Dr. Stephen Ostroff
Represented By: Roger Joseph Gural
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Lara E FitzSimmons
Represented By: Trang Doan Hoang
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Jaros
Represented By: Deanne M Mazzochi
Represented By: William Andrew Rakoczy
Represented By: Jerrold A Thrope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Apotex Corporation
Represented By: Lara E FitzSimmons
Represented By: Trang Doan Hoang
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Jaros
Represented By: Deanne M Mazzochi
Represented By: William Andrew Rakoczy
Represented By: Jerrold A Thrope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Burgess
Represented By: Sarah K Frederick
Represented By: Christopher T Holding
Represented By: William M Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alembic Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: Arthur Y Tsien
Represented By: Dennies Varughese
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Weinrieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Ashmore
Represented By: A Neal Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Suchira Ghosh
Represented By: Delphine Knight Brown
Represented By: Chad A Landmon
Represented By: William C Rose
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?