Johnson v. Duncan et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Johnson, Jr.
Defendant: Arne Duncan and Department of Education
Case Number: 8:2015cv01820
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Prince George's
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/23/2018. (c/m 5/24/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/11/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 2/1/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Duncan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arne Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?