Acosta et al v. Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Ronald Layne Smith, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Reginald J. Belton, Christopher R. Simmons, Terry D. Evans, Andrew Michael Booth, Jacob Whetstone, Angela Vanette Barnes, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr., Johnnie F. Bines, Thomas W. Burns, Erik J. Burch, Mitchell P. Gill, Jody Lee Piercy, Edwin Steele, Michael A. Grochowski, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., John David Fielder, Brian Keith Lloyd, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Chad Robert Read, Terry Salazar, James Robin, Rigo A. Gonzalez, David A. Montgomery, Cory Orlando McGill, Anthony Brett Ogden, Rodney W. Meece, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Michael L. Caldwell, Jason D. Farquharson, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Michael J. Kidder, Michael A. LeBlanc, Edward Leo Ferguson, Charles Raymond Riippi, Kevin L. Woodrum, Everette D. Avery, Jr., Brian David Murphy, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Ernest Richard Roth, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr., Edwin Keith, Sr., Jeffrey S. Church, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Lee Lowe, Timothy Steven Parke, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Wade Jacobson, Michael S. Eddy, Lewis Palmer, Michael L. Songy, Jeffrey A. Meo, Amanda J. Engen, Raphael A. Zamora, Ozane Jackson, Ryan Martin DeLong, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Rowena L. Darvin, Travis M. Bassett, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr., Karl Malinski Gibbs, Brad L. Fruhling, Timothy Donald Fendley, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr., Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr., Andrew E. Coussens, Earnest J. Ellison, Theodore J. Bill, Eric B. McLendon, Howard Leon Slade, Scott H. Stradley, Frederick D. McCollum, Wanda N. Jackson, Jason R. Bills, Brian Earl Easley, William G. Cardwell, Jason Paul Hatfield, Napolean L. Stafford, Franklin O. Snow, David Brian DeLuca, Ryan V. Collamore, Shawn E. Strout, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Philip Lam, Carter Charles Ruff, Tracy L. Asher, Sean M. Ladd, Azariah Smith, Jr., Brandon Christopher Johnston, Robert Wagenaar, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Richard J. Nicholls, Nathan P. Turnock, Bonnie Dunlop, William Magee, Patrick C. Mondragon, John Ernest Carlson, Stephen Randall Keith, James Pollock, Nathan T. Meidl, Richard Alan Hardison, Jesse N. Davidson, John R. Fudala, Hobart P. Saunders, Erik D. Upham, Thomas S. Edwards, Charles J. Barnes, Reginald Fleming, Jr., Damian L Smith, Brandy E. Broadbent, David F. Bryden, Aundrea M. Hunt, Shameran Youkhana, Jose C. Roque, Daniel Martin Jasoni, John Albert McDonald, Laura J. Nowlin, Christopher T. Thornhill, Kole Welsh, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Steven C. Zimmerman, James E. Kirk, Wayne Rodriguez, Tom Lee Gallagher, Jesse Baker, Juan Lugo, Michael E. Zundle, Anterian D. Johnson, Cliburn Lane, Jr., Connie G. Conley, Neal Mark Sutherland, Julian K. Jones, Dale Ford, Anthony K. Steward, Kenley Feazell, Brian K. Bower, Joseph Edward Devall, William O. Roark III, Michael W. Carr, Leonard Goodson, III, Travis Adams, Alan Austin Mays, Jason William Smith, Steven Wayne Holley, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Frank Earl Braxton, Brenda M. O'Neal, Richard Michael Clemes, Sami Juma, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr., Calvin Priest, Jason L. Carmen, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, David W. Kirkland, Daniel R. Reyes, Robert Christopher Elesky, Larry Haynes, Tommy L. Fullen, Clyde Richard Holder, Edward B. Weibl, Michael Ray Fields, Francisco Araque, Theta A. Olson, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Michael Farmer, Tommy R. Reddick, Omowunmi Martins, Justin M. Faircloth, Michael Christopher Stanco, David P. Staffa, Charles J. Lowery, Craig J. Daniel, Michael P. Gibson, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael Lee Maynard, Ronald Lee Frisby, Thomas K. Oleson, Daniel R. Kearney, Roland David Schulz, Milton M. Reynolds, Michael L. Madigan, Brandi L. Benson, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Thomas K. Jones, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Daniel Maestas, Tai Porter, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Simon Allen Wade, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Daniel Lee Davis, Mary A. Mickens, Gregory D. Parker, Mikel Harper, David Allen Jones, II, James Cuthbert Midgett, Scott Allan Christie, Varita V. Quincy, Gregory J. Pietz, Carl Orlando, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Donald P. Worrell, Craig Belanger, Hanna P. Nissan, Jason B. Martin, Michele A. Pearce, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr., Ryan L. Attar, Clifford Yarbrough, Patti J. Anderson, Steven S. Richardson, Jon Harding Mason, Christine Osorio, Larry Baker, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Tee Jay Burr, William Emmett White, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr., Michael A. Cranfill, Malone W. Davis, Samuel Nieves, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric Jaeger, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr., Anthony Trinidad, Gordon Allen Ward, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Arthur Whiteside, Tracy Lemar Smith, James Eric Kelley, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Paul A. Richmond, Marek M. Sipko, Thomas Andersen, Cassandra D. Eusery, Gregory C. Skyles, Suzanne M. Speight, Willie J. Mitchell, Robert William Paxton, George Keys, Jr., Trevor G. Ennis, Anthony L. Arrington, Timothy M. Murray, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Matthew K. Ashworth, William James Heard, Belinda M. Williams, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Milan B. Thakkar, Audrey S. Perry, Ervin L. Walker, Kristin Southwell, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Rachael Brown, Jonathan Medina, Christina L. Lee, Rahman A. McKinnon, Fayiz Nalu, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr., Richard P. Hamilton, Alan K. Bridgewater, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Tanya Quincy, James Preston Potter, Jr., Andre Demon Glenn, Bryan L. Stevens, Bruce L. Reges, Michael S. Delborrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Debora J. Pfaff, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Dennis A. Blanchard, Karen M. Gharst, Julio A. Apodaca, Jamar Ham, Kori L. Willis, Michael Leonard Farley, Christopher S. Henrikson, John Alan Bacon, Eric Bradley Gann, Jeremen Sandoval, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Ricky L. Turner, Julio Pipino Walton, Derrick D. Clark, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Shawn K. McLeod, Clarence William Wickham, John G. Duerr, David John Smith, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Allison Mariko Hill, Kenon L. Burns, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Robin Kruskol, Tony L. Wright, Sr., David B. Swaney, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Timothy J. Watson, William Myron Henderson, Kathleen S. Coy, Michael D. Kusek, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Brittany J. Davis, Victor M. Rivera, James Robert Sandefur, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr., Robert L Williams, Alexander Menkes, Lauren Carol Price, Blain L. Chambers, Paul G. Jones, Michael Charles Lee, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Paul Anthony Jones, Bryan Hamilton, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr., Daniel E. Valentine, James Austin Fisher, Justin Acosta, David M. Swan, Rene L. Wilson, Bruce G. Laureiro, Craig D. Fillingane, Amanda G. Miller, David F. Happle, Tony Williams, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr., Bradley Doyle, Scott D. Bailey, Leon J. Alexander, George L. Watson III, Perry A. Cross, Jr., James R Bates, James Edward Miller, Ronald Perry Sharp, Daniel M. Robshaw, Shawn R. Devaney, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr., Robert A. Dreyfus, Robert Lippolis, Michelle A. Johnson, Stepheny Gupton, Daniel B. Schultz, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Murrill L. McLean, Leonard Ray Cheek, Richard D. Rice, Michael W. Hafke, Leonard Ritums, Micky Doto, Phillip A. Anderson, Michael Daniel Banks, Robert P. Busse, Teddric O'Neal Walker, Blaine S. Child, Dennis H. Budd, Troy Thomas, Jarrod C. Hall, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Mark A. Hill, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, Paul R. Vadney, John L. Henderson, Dennis E. McMullen, David B. Whaling, Richard D. Celia, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Jennifer L. Downes, Bryan Keith Keese, James Corey Ellis, Clint Allen Blankenship, Julie Baron-Mannix, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr., Michael A. Northup, Robin A. Carr, James Hershel Hudson, III, Ronnal Womack, Michael A. Jr. Griley, Carrie C. Gallagher, Edwin Todd Turpin, Andrea M. Caston, Keith R. Menzer and Bruce R. Chaplin
Defendant: KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton Company and Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc
Receiver: Jimmy Dwayne Williams
Case Number: 8:2015cv03836
Filed: December 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Roger W Titus
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 80 Clerk's Order Taxing Costs re: (115 in 8:10-cv-01160-RWT, 123 in 8:09-cv-02749-RWT, 116 in 8:11-cv-00337-RWT, 92 in 8:15-cv-02404-RWT, 111 in 8:10-cv-00836-RWT, 118 in 8:11-cv-00336-RWT, 124 in 8:09-cv-02986-RWT, 128 in 8:09-cv-02985-RWT, 134 in 8:09-cv-02743-RWT, 128 in 8:09-cv-02980-RWT, 93 in 8:15-cv-01568-RWT, 68 in 8:15-cv-04020-RWT, 126 in 8:09-cv-02746-RWT, 107 in 8:11-cv-01092-RWT, 132 in 8:09-cv-02744-RWT, 112 in 8:11-cv-00338-RWT, 133 in 8:10-cv-03360-RWT, 130 in 8:09-cv-02740-RWT, 116 in 8:09-cv-03310-RWT, 123 in 8:10-cv-00814-RWT, 136 in 8:09-cv-02739-RWT, 119 in 8:09-cv-03303-RWT, 117 in 8:09-cv-03309-RWT, 105 in 8:11-cv-03292-RWT, 117 in 8:09-cv-03314-RWT, 128 in 8:09-cv-02981-RWT, 105 in 8:12-cv-03070-RWT, 112 in 8:10-cv-00388-RWT, 126 in 8:10-cv-00815-RWT, 126 in 8:09-cv-02741-RWT, 95 in 8:13-cv-01023-RWT, 119 in 8:09-cv-03299-RWT, 122 in 8:09-cv-02982-RWT, 127 in 8:09-cv-02987-RWT, 117 in 8:09-cv-03300-RWT, 124 in 8:09-cv-03313-RWT, 119 in 8:09-cv-03307-RWT, 104 in 8:11-cv-02634-RWT, 118 in 8:09-cv-03315-RWT, 183 in 8:09-cv-02748-RWT, 123 in 8:09-cv-03316-RWT, 104 in 8:11-cv-02635-RWT, 132 in 8:09-cv-02747-RWT, 130 in 8:09-cv-02742-RWT, 99 in 8:11-cv-03542-RWT, 120 in 8:09-cv-03306-RWT, 123 in 8:09-cv-03304-RWT, 137 in 8:09-cv-02750-RWT, 125 in 8:09-cv-02979-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-03305-RWT, 117 in 8:10-cv-00389-RWT, 122 in 8:10-cv-00390-RWT, 117 in 8:09-cv-03311-RWT, 120 in 8:09-cv-03301-RWT, 118 in 8:09-cv-03302-RWT, 53 in 8:16-cv-02880-RWT, 78 in 8:15-cv-03836-RWT, 79 in 8:15-cv-03531-RWT, 127 in 8:09-cv-02984-RWT, 128 in 8:09-cv-02745-RWT, 119 in 8:09-cv-03308-RWT, 127 in 8:09-cv-02983-RWT, 506 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 167 in 8:09-cv-00744-RWT) Bill of Costs,,,,,, (116 in 8:09-cv-03316-RWT, 113 in 8:09-cv-03301-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03311-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-03315-RWT, 125 in 8:09-cv-02744-RWT, 116 in 8:09-cv-02749-RWT, 118 in 8:09-cv-02979-RWT, 88 in 8:13-cv-01023-RWT, 126 in 8:10-cv-03360-RWT, 100 in 8:11-cv-01092-RWT, 72 in 8:15-cv-03531-RWT, 160 in 8:09-cv-00744-RWT, 108 in 8:10-cv-01160-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03307-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02985-RWT, 176 in 8:09-cv-02748-RWT, 120 in 8:09-cv-02984-RWT, 119 in 8:10-cv-00815-RWT, 98 in 8:12-cv-03070-RWT, 110 in 8:10-cv-00389-RWT, 46 in 8:16-cv-02880-RWT, 86 in 8:15-cv-01568-RWT, 117 in 8:09-cv-03313-RWT, 109 in 8:09-cv-03310-RWT, 109 in 8:11-cv-00337-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03299-RWT, 104 in 8:10-cv-00836-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02980-RWT, 119 in 8:09-cv-02746-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02745-RWT, 113 in 8:09-cv-03306-RWT, 125 in 8:09-cv-02747-RWT, 71 in 8:15-cv-03836-RWT, 130 in 8:09-cv-02750-RWT, 98 in 8:11-cv-03292-RWT, 92 in 8:11-cv-03542-RWT, 123 in 8:09-cv-02740-RWT, 114 in 8:09-cv-03305-RWT, 119 in 8:09-cv-02741-RWT, 120 in 8:09-cv-02983-RWT, 61 in 8:15-cv-04020-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03300-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-03302-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03308-RWT, 115 in 8:09-cv-02982-RWT, 97 in 8:11-cv-02635-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03303-RWT, 116 in 8:09-cv-03304-RWT, 120 in 8:09-cv-02987-RWT, 117 in 8:09-cv-02986-RWT, 487 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 115 in 8:10-cv-00390-RWT, 97 in 8:11-cv-02634-RWT, 105 in 8:11-cv-00338-RWT, 123 in 8:09-cv-02742-RWT, 85 in 8:15-cv-02404-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03314-RWT, 105 in 8:10-cv-00388-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02981-RWT, 129 in 8:09-cv-02739-RWT, 116 in 8:10-cv-00814-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03309-RWT, 111 in 8:11-cv-00336-RWT, 127 in 8:09-cv-02743-RWT) Bill of Costs. Costs are taxed in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs in the amount of $272,862.20 and included in the judgment. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(decs, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re (506 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT) Bill of Costs,,,,,, filed by Justin Acosta.Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Ledlie, James)
August 16, 2018 Filing 78 BILL OF COSTS Motion to Renew ECF 487 by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Inc, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLCAssociated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting (500) Motion to Vacate re 471 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 10/11/2017. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2017 Filing 76 Amended MOTION to Vacate (471 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT) Order on Motion to Seal by Alan Metzgar, Justin Acosta (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Ledlie, James)
October 10, 2017 Filing 75 Joint MOTION to Vacate (471 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT) Order on Motion to Seal by Alan Metzgar, Justin Acosta (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Ledlie, James)
September 13, 2017 Filing 74 PAPERLESS ORDER re: (116 in 8:09-cv-03316-RWT, 113 in 8:09-cv-03301-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03311-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-03315-RWT, 125 in 8:09-cv-02744-RWT, 116 in 8:09-cv-02749-RWT, 118 in 8:09-cv-02979-RWT, 88 in 8:13-cv-01023-RWT, 126 in 8:10-cv-03360-RWT, 100 in 8:11-cv-01092-RWT, 72 in 8:15-cv-03531-RWT, 160 in 8:09-cv-00744-RWT, 108 in 8:10-cv-01160-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03307-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02985-RWT, 176 in 8:09-cv-02748-RWT, 120 in 8:09-cv-02984-RWT, 119 in 8:10-cv-00815-RWT, 98 in 8:12-cv-03070-RWT, 110 in 8:10-cv-00389-RWT, 46 in 8:16-cv-02880-RWT, 86 in 8:15-cv-01568-RWT, 117 in 8:09-cv-03313-RWT, 109 in 8:09-cv-03310-RWT, 109 in 8:11-cv-00337-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03299-RWT, 104 in 8:10-cv-00836-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02980-RWT, 119 in 8:09-cv-02746-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02745-RWT, 113 in 8:09-cv-03306-RWT, 125 in 8:09-cv-02747-RWT, 71 in 8:15-cv-03836-RWT, 130 in 8:09-cv-02750-RWT, 98 in 8:11-cv-03292-RWT, 92 in 8:11-cv-03542-RWT, 123 in 8:09-cv-02740-RWT, 114 in 8:09-cv-03305-RWT, 119 in 8:09-cv-02741-RWT, 120 in 8:09-cv-02983-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03300-RWT, 61 in 8:15-cv-04020-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-03302-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03308-RWT, 115 in 8:09-cv-02982-RWT, 97 in 8:11-cv-02635-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03303-RWT, 116 in 8:09-cv-03304-RWT, 120 in 8:09-cv-02987-RWT, 117 in 8:09-cv-02986-RWT, 487 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 115 in 8:10-cv-00390-RWT, 97 in 8:11-cv-02634-RWT, 123 in 8:09-cv-02742-RWT, 105 in 8:11-cv-00338-RWT, 85 in 8:15-cv-02404-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03314-RWT, 105 in 8:10-cv-00388-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02981-RWT, 129 in 8:09-cv-02739-RWT, 116 in 8:10-cv-00814-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03309-RWT, 111 in 8:11-cv-00336-RWT, 127 in 8:09-cv-02743-RWT) Bill of Costs. Costs are denied without prejudice to filing a new bill of costs within fourteen days of the U.S. Court of Appeals issuing any mandate affirming judgment. See Guidelines for Bills I.F. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.Signed by Clerk on 9/13/2017 (decs, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2017 Filing 73 REPLY to Response in Opposition to Bill of Costs filed by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC.Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
August 16, 2017 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re (116 in 8:09-cv-03316-RWT, 113 in 8:09-cv-03301-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03311-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-03315-RWT, 125 in 8:09-cv-02744-RWT, 116 in 8:09-cv-02749-RWT, 118 in 8:09-cv-02979-RWT, 88 in 8:13-cv-01023-RWT, 126 in 8:10-cv-03360-RWT, 100 in 8:11-cv-01092-RWT, 72 in 8:15-cv-03531-RWT, 160 in 8:09-cv-00744-RWT, 108 in 8:10-cv-01160-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03307-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02985-RWT, 176 in 8:09-cv-02748-RWT, 120 in 8:09-cv-02984-RWT, 119 in 8:10-cv-00815-RWT, 98 in 8:12-cv-03070-RWT, 110 in 8:10-cv-00389-RWT, 46 in 8:16-cv-02880-RWT, 86 in 8:15-cv-01568-RWT, 117 in 8:09-cv-03313-RWT, 109 in 8:09-cv-03310-RWT, 109 in 8:11-cv-00337-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03299-RWT, 104 in 8:10-cv-00836-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02980-RWT, 119 in 8:09-cv-02746-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02745-RWT, 113 in 8:09-cv-03306-RWT, 125 in 8:09-cv-02747-RWT, 71 in 8:15-cv-03836-RWT, 130 in 8:09-cv-02750-RWT, 98 in 8:11-cv-03292-RWT, 92 in 8:11-cv-03542-RWT, 123 in 8:09-cv-02740-RWT, 114 in 8:09-cv-03305-RWT, 120 in 8:09-cv-02983-RWT, 119 in 8:09-cv-02741-RWT, 61 in 8:15-cv-04020-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03300-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-03302-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03308-RWT, 115 in 8:09-cv-02982-RWT, 97 in 8:11-cv-02635-RWT, 112 in 8:09-cv-03303-RWT, 116 in 8:09-cv-03304-RWT, 120 in 8:09-cv-02987-RWT, 117 in 8:09-cv-02986-RWT, 487 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 115 in 8:10-cv-00390-RWT, 97 in 8:11-cv-02634-RWT, 105 in 8:11-cv-00338-RWT, 123 in 8:09-cv-02742-RWT, 85 in 8:15-cv-02404-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03314-RWT, 105 in 8:10-cv-00388-RWT, 121 in 8:09-cv-02981-RWT, 129 in 8:09-cv-02739-RWT, 116 in 8:10-cv-00814-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-03309-RWT, 111 in 8:11-cv-00336-RWT, 127 in 8:09-cv-02743-RWT) Bill of Costs,,,,,, filed by Robert Bidinger, Brian Blumline, Unknown Part(y)(ies), Justin Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Burke, Susan)
August 2, 2017 Filing 71 BILL OF COSTS by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Bill, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 451 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1); directing that all Complaints are Dismissed; denying 463 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Hundreds of Declarations; directing clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/19/2017. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2017 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/19/2017. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Titus, Roger)
March 24, 2017 Filing 68 Memorandum re (101 in 8:09-cv-02982-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02981-RWT, 97 in 8:09-cv-03315-RWT, 84 in 8:11-cv-03292-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-02747-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02980-RWT, 113 in 8:09-cv-02743-RWT, 83 in 8:11-cv-02635-RWT, 57 in 8:15-cv-03836-RWT, 96 in 8:10-cv-00389-RWT, 90 in 8:10-cv-00836-RWT, 102 in 8:09-cv-02749-RWT, 78 in 8:11-cv-03542-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03314-RWT, 103 in 8:09-cv-02986-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-02744-RWT, 104 in 8:09-cv-02979-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02985-RWT, 162 in 8:09-cv-02748-RWT, 106 in 8:09-cv-02984-RWT, 32 in 8:16-cv-02880-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02745-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03309-RWT, 94 in 8:10-cv-01160-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03311-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03307-RWT, 109 in 8:09-cv-02740-RWT, 146 in 8:09-cv-00744-RWT, 109 in 8:09-cv-02742-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03300-RWT, 116 in 8:09-cv-02750-RWT, 105 in 8:09-cv-02746-RWT, 95 in 8:11-cv-00337-RWT, 105 in 8:09-cv-02741-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03303-RWT, 83 in 8:11-cv-02634-RWT, 451 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03308-RWT, 106 in 8:09-cv-02983-RWT, 102 in 8:10-cv-00814-RWT, 47 in 8:15-cv-04020-RWT, 106 in 8:09-cv-02987-RWT, 84 in 8:12-cv-03070-RWT, 97 in 8:11-cv-00336-RWT, 102 in 8:09-cv-03304-RWT, 115 in 8:09-cv-02739-RWT, 101 in 8:10-cv-00390-RWT, 103 in 8:09-cv-03313-RWT, 105 in 8:10-cv-00815-RWT, 112 in 8:10-cv-03360-RWT, 74 in 8:13-cv-01023-RWT, 91 in 8:10-cv-00388-RWT, 95 in 8:09-cv-03310-RWT, 86 in 8:11-cv-01092-RWT, 102 in 8:09-cv-03316-RWT, 97 in 8:09-cv-03302-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03299-RWT, 71 in 8:15-cv-02404-RWT, 91 in 8:11-cv-00338-RWT, 72 in 8:15-cv-01568-RWT, 58 in 8:15-cv-03531-RWT, 99 in 8:09-cv-03301-RWT, 100 in 8:09-cv-03305-RWT, 99 in 8:09-cv-03306-RWT) MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1) Post-Hearing Brief filed by Brown & Root Services, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc..Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
March 24, 2017 Filing 67 Memorandum re (101 in 8:09-cv-02982-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02981-RWT, 97 in 8:09-cv-03315-RWT, 84 in 8:11-cv-03292-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-02747-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02980-RWT, 113 in 8:09-cv-02743-RWT, 83 in 8:11-cv-02635-RWT, 57 in 8:15-cv-03836-RWT, 96 in 8:10-cv-00389-RWT, 90 in 8:10-cv-00836-RWT, 102 in 8:09-cv-02749-RWT, 78 in 8:11-cv-03542-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03314-RWT, 103 in 8:09-cv-02986-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-02744-RWT, 104 in 8:09-cv-02979-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02985-RWT, 162 in 8:09-cv-02748-RWT, 106 in 8:09-cv-02984-RWT, 32 in 8:16-cv-02880-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02745-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03309-RWT, 94 in 8:10-cv-01160-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03311-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03307-RWT, 109 in 8:09-cv-02740-RWT, 146 in 8:09-cv-00744-RWT, 109 in 8:09-cv-02742-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03300-RWT, 116 in 8:09-cv-02750-RWT, 105 in 8:09-cv-02746-RWT, 95 in 8:11-cv-00337-RWT, 105 in 8:09-cv-02741-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03303-RWT, 83 in 8:11-cv-02634-RWT, 451 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03308-RWT, 106 in 8:09-cv-02983-RWT, 102 in 8:10-cv-00814-RWT, 47 in 8:15-cv-04020-RWT, 106 in 8:09-cv-02987-RWT, 84 in 8:12-cv-03070-RWT, 97 in 8:11-cv-00336-RWT, 102 in 8:09-cv-03304-RWT, 115 in 8:09-cv-02739-RWT, 101 in 8:10-cv-00390-RWT, 103 in 8:09-cv-03313-RWT, 105 in 8:10-cv-00815-RWT, 112 in 8:10-cv-03360-RWT, 74 in 8:13-cv-01023-RWT, 91 in 8:10-cv-00388-RWT, 95 in 8:09-cv-03310-RWT, 86 in 8:11-cv-01092-RWT, 102 in 8:09-cv-03316-RWT, 97 in 8:09-cv-03302-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03299-RWT, 71 in 8:15-cv-02404-RWT, 91 in 8:11-cv-00338-RWT, 72 in 8:15-cv-01568-RWT, 58 in 8:15-cv-03531-RWT, 99 in 8:09-cv-03301-RWT, 100 in 8:09-cv-03305-RWT, 99 in 8:09-cv-03306-RWT) MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1) Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Brief in Further Opposition to KBR's Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed by Justin Acosta.Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Baker, Frederick)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 (VACATED) ORDER granting (454) Motion to Seal in case 8:09-md-02083-RWT. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 3/9/2017. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/23/2017 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
February 27, 2017 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re (463 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 463 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT) MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Hundreds of Declarations MOTION for Sanctions filed by Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc..Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER setting deadlines for Response/Rely to 463 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Hundreds of Declarations and for Appropriate Relief. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 2/21/2017. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2017 Filing 63 Supplemental to (463 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 463 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT) MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Hundreds of Declarations MOTION for Sanctions filed by Brown & Root Services, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc. (Exhibits to Motion) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
February 16, 2017 Filing 62 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Hundreds of Declarations, MOTION for Sanctions by Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
February 15, 2017 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re (101 in 8:09-cv-02982-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02981-RWT, 97 in 8:09-cv-03315-RWT, 84 in 8:11-cv-03292-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-02747-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02980-RWT, 113 in 8:09-cv-02743-RWT, 83 in 8:11-cv-02635-RWT, 57 in 8:15-cv-03836-RWT, 96 in 8:10-cv-00389-RWT, 90 in 8:10-cv-00836-RWT, 102 in 8:09-cv-02749-RWT, 78 in 8:11-cv-03542-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03314-RWT, 103 in 8:09-cv-02986-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-02744-RWT, 104 in 8:09-cv-02979-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02985-RWT, 162 in 8:09-cv-02748-RWT, 106 in 8:09-cv-02984-RWT, 32 in 8:16-cv-02880-RWT, 107 in 8:09-cv-02745-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03309-RWT, 94 in 8:10-cv-01160-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03311-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03307-RWT, 109 in 8:09-cv-02740-RWT, 146 in 8:09-cv-00744-RWT, 109 in 8:09-cv-02742-RWT, 96 in 8:09-cv-03300-RWT, 116 in 8:09-cv-02750-RWT, 105 in 8:09-cv-02746-RWT, 95 in 8:11-cv-00337-RWT, 105 in 8:09-cv-02741-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03303-RWT, 83 in 8:11-cv-02634-RWT, 451 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03308-RWT, 106 in 8:09-cv-02983-RWT, 102 in 8:10-cv-00814-RWT, 47 in 8:15-cv-04020-RWT, 106 in 8:09-cv-02987-RWT, 84 in 8:12-cv-03070-RWT, 97 in 8:11-cv-00336-RWT, 102 in 8:09-cv-03304-RWT, 115 in 8:09-cv-02739-RWT, 101 in 8:10-cv-00390-RWT, 103 in 8:09-cv-03313-RWT, 105 in 8:10-cv-00815-RWT, 112 in 8:10-cv-03360-RWT, 74 in 8:13-cv-01023-RWT, 91 in 8:10-cv-00388-RWT, 95 in 8:09-cv-03310-RWT, 86 in 8:11-cv-01092-RWT, 102 in 8:09-cv-03316-RWT, 97 in 8:09-cv-03302-RWT, 98 in 8:09-cv-03299-RWT, 71 in 8:15-cv-02404-RWT, 91 in 8:11-cv-00338-RWT, 72 in 8:15-cv-01568-RWT, 58 in 8:15-cv-03531-RWT, 99 in 8:09-cv-03301-RWT, 100 in 8:09-cv-03305-RWT, 99 in 8:09-cv-03306-RWT) MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1) filed by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
February 7, 2017 Filing 60 Joint Correspondence re: March Evidentiary Hearing Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Castello, Brian)
January 26, 2017 Filing 59 STATUS REPORT by Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc.Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
January 17, 2017 Filing 58 Supplemental to (451 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 111 in 8:09-cv-02747-RWT, 106 in 8:09-cv-02984-RWT, 146 in 8:09-cv-00744-RWT) MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1) filed by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, ERKA Ltd., Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC Corrected Exhibits 36 and 71 Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
January 13, 2017 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1) by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, KBR, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Kellog Brown & Root LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Facts in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 01-03, #5 Exhibit 04, Part 01, #6 Exhibit 04, Part 02, #7 Exhibit 04, Part 03, #8 Exhibit 04, Part 04, #9 Exhibit 04, Part 05, #10 Exhibit 04, Part 06, #11 Exhibit 04, Part 07, #12 Exhibit 04, Part 08, #13 Exhibit 04, Part 09, #14 Exhibit 04, Part 10, #15 Exhibit 04, Part 11, #16 Exhibit 04, Part 12, #17 Exhibit 04, Part 13, #18 Exhibit 04, Part 14, #19 Exhibit 05-16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18-27, #22 Exhibit 28-41, #23 Exhibit 42-63, #24 Exhibit 64-85, #25 Exhibit 86-98, #26 Exhibit 99, #27 Exhibit 100, #28 Exhibit 101-111, #29 Exhibit 112-122, #30 Exhibit 123-128, #31 Exhibit 129-140, #32 Exhibit 141, Part 01, #33 Exhibit 141, Part 02, #34 Exhibit 141, Part 03, #35 Exhibit 142-145, #36 Exhibit 146-156)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Amending Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 12/2/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2016 Telephone Conference held on 12/2/2016 before Judge Roger W. Titus. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(cmcs, Chambers)
November 10, 2016 Telephone Conference held on 11/10/2016 before Judge Roger W. Titus. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(cmc, Chambers)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER suspending all remaining dates in the Second Amended Case Management Orderon Jurisdictional Discovery; setting date for telephone status conference. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/10/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/3/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Titus, Roger)
November 2, 2016 Filing 53 STIPULATION of the Parties to Amend the Case Management Order (Joint Stipulation) by Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
October 31, 2016 Filing 52 STATUS REPORT by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, ERKA Ltd., Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Castello, Brian)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM/ORDER rescheduling Hearing to December 13-14, 2016, with a continuation on December 15, 2016, in the event that additional time is needed. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 10/14/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian W Castello on behalf of Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, KBR, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Kellog Brown & Root LLC Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Castello, Brian)
October 7, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Razi on behalf of Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, KBR, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Kellog Brown & Root LLC Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Razi, Benjamin)
October 5, 2016 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT Parties' Joint Status Report by Haliburton Company, Halliburton, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Inc, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc, KBR, Inc., KBR, Inc., KBR, Inc., KBR, Inc., KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Matthews, Robert)
September 14, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/26/16, before Judge Roger W. Titus. Total number of pages filed: 40. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber, 301-344-3104, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(krcs, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting (428) Motion for Extension of Time; directing plaintiff's to serve answers to Interrogatories 19 and 20 on a rolling basis as information is obtained, with answers to be fully completed no later than September 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 9/14/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2016 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re (428 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT) Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Replies due by 9/26/2016. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
September 6, 2016 Filing 44 Correspondence from Margaret T. Brenner re Counsel of Record for case RWT 16-cv-2880 Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting (417) Motion by defendant's to Compel; directing plaintiffs to serve full and completed answers to Interrogatory Nos. 19 and 20 on or before September 9, 2016; denying 419 and 420 Motion by Plaintiff's to Compel; directing that the parties shall comply with 399 Second Amended Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 8/29/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2016 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re (420 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT) Corrected MOTION to Amend/Correct (419) MOTION to Compel filed by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC. Replies due by 9/12/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM / ORDER scheduling a recorded hearing for Friday, August 26, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 8/23/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2016 Filing 40 MOTION to Compel and to Clarify CMO Obligations by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC Responses due by 9/9/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memo in Supp of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM/ ORDER requiring parties to submit a status report by August 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/21/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2016 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying as moot(392) MOTION for Other Relief Regarding Search Terms for POI Data ; denying (405) MOTION to Compel Production of Emails in case 8:09-md-02083-RWT. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 6/23/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2016 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re (405 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT) MOTION to Compel Production of Emails filed by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC. Replies due by 7/5/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM/ORDER scheduling a hearing for June 23, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 6/14/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2016 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT by Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
May 5, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul W Schmidt on behalf of Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Schmidt, Paul)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Discovery Stipulated Order Regarding Produced Privileged Material. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 5/2/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2016: #1 Order) (aos, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 5/2/2016 (aos, Deputy Clerk).
May 1, 2016 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Other Relief (for Entry of Stipulated Order Regarding Produced Privileged Material) by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC Responses due by 5/19/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Clawback Agreement)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ON JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 4/26/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Supplemental Protective Order Governing Disclosure and Use of Confidential Information. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 4/26/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2016 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT Parties' Joint Status Report by KBR, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER on Test Search. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 4/5/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2016 Filing 25 RESPONSE re (67 in 8:09-cv-03305-RWT, 61 in 8:10-cv-01160-RWT, 65 in 8:09-cv-03308-RWT, 72 in 8:09-cv-02741-RWT, 82 in 8:09-cv-02739-RWT, 72 in 8:10-cv-00815-RWT, 25 in 8:15-cv-03531-RWT, 50 in 8:11-cv-02634-RWT, 57 in 8:10-cv-00836-RWT, 14 in 8:15-cv-04020-RWT, 62 in 8:11-cv-00337-RWT, 63 in 8:09-cv-03309-RWT, 73 in 8:09-cv-02983-RWT, 129 in 8:09-cv-02748-RWT, 79 in 8:10-cv-03360-RWT, 73 in 8:09-cv-02984-RWT, 24 in 8:15-cv-03836-RWT, 58 in 8:11-cv-00338-RWT, 69 in 8:09-cv-03304-RWT, 71 in 8:09-cv-02979-RWT, 63 in 8:09-cv-03314-RWT, 63 in 8:09-cv-03300-RWT, 39 in 8:15-cv-01568-RWT, 80 in 8:09-cv-02743-RWT, 68 in 8:10-cv-00390-RWT, 74 in 8:09-cv-02981-RWT, 78 in 8:09-cv-02747-RWT, 74 in 8:09-cv-02985-RWT, 63 in 8:10-cv-00389-RWT, 69 in 8:09-cv-02749-RWT, 66 in 8:09-cv-03301-RWT, 62 in 8:09-cv-03310-RWT, 66 in 8:09-cv-03306-RWT, 73 in 8:09-cv-02987-RWT, 65 in 8:09-cv-03307-RWT, 45 in 8:11-cv-03542-RWT, 64 in 8:11-cv-00336-RWT, 113 in 8:09-cv-00744-RWT, 50 in 8:11-cv-02635-RWT, 51 in 8:12-cv-03070-RWT, 392 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 68 in 8:09-cv-02982-RWT, 74 in 8:09-cv-02745-RWT, 64 in 8:09-cv-03315-RWT, 83 in 8:09-cv-02750-RWT, 64 in 8:09-cv-03302-RWT, 70 in 8:09-cv-02986-RWT, 63 in 8:09-cv-03311-RWT, 41 in 8:13-cv-01023-RWT, 76 in 8:09-cv-02740-RWT, 65 in 8:09-cv-03303-RWT, 65 in 8:09-cv-03299-RWT, 76 in 8:09-cv-02742-RWT, 69 in 8:09-cv-03316-RWT, 38 in 8:15-cv-02404-RWT, 74 in 8:09-cv-02980-RWT, 51 in 8:11-cv-03292-RWT, 70 in 8:09-cv-03313-RWT, 53 in 8:11-cv-01092-RWT, 72 in 8:09-cv-02746-RWT, 78 in 8:09-cv-02744-RWT, 58 in 8:10-cv-00388-RWT, 69 in 8:10-cv-00814-RWT) MOTION for Other Relief Regarding Search Terms for POI Data, (393 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT) Response to Motion, filed by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
April 1, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Other Relief Regarding Search Terms for POI Data by Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc. Responses due by 4/18/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Comparison of Proposed Search Terms, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
March 22, 2016 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re (11 in 8:15-cv-04020-RWT, 75 in 8:09-cv-02747-RWT, 70 in 8:09-cv-02983-RWT, 63 in 8:09-cv-03301-RWT, 64 in 8:09-cv-03305-RWT, 79 in 8:09-cv-02739-RWT, 126 in 8:09-cv-02748-RWT, 42 in 8:11-cv-03542-RWT, 58 in 8:10-cv-01160-RWT, 65 in 8:10-cv-00390-RWT, 48 in 8:11-cv-03292-RWT, 38 in 8:13-cv-01023-RWT, 60 in 8:09-cv-03300-RWT, 54 in 8:10-cv-00836-RWT, 73 in 8:09-cv-02740-RWT, 35 in 8:15-cv-02404-RWT, 22 in 8:15-cv-03531-RWT, 110 in 8:09-cv-00744-RWT, 50 in 8:11-cv-01092-RWT, 66 in 8:10-cv-00814-RWT, 69 in 8:09-cv-02746-RWT, 70 in 8:09-cv-02984-RWT, 62 in 8:09-cv-03307-RWT, 73 in 8:09-cv-02742-RWT, 62 in 8:09-cv-03299-RWT, 60 in 8:09-cv-03311-RWT, 385 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT, 47 in 8:11-cv-02634-RWT, 36 in 8:15-cv-01568-RWT, 55 in 8:10-cv-00388-RWT, 68 in 8:09-cv-02979-RWT, 67 in 8:09-cv-03313-RWT, 65 in 8:09-cv-02982-RWT, 62 in 8:09-cv-03303-RWT, 61 in 8:09-cv-03302-RWT, 77 in 8:09-cv-02743-RWT, 66 in 8:09-cv-03304-RWT, 61 in 8:11-cv-00336-RWT, 48 in 8:12-cv-03070-RWT, 62 in 8:09-cv-03308-RWT, 69 in 8:10-cv-00815-RWT, 61 in 8:09-cv-03315-RWT, 76 in 8:10-cv-03360-RWT, 63 in 8:09-cv-03306-RWT, 66 in 8:09-cv-02749-RWT, 71 in 8:09-cv-02981-RWT, 80 in 8:09-cv-02750-RWT, 69 in 8:09-cv-02741-RWT, 75 in 8:09-cv-02744-RWT, 55 in 8:11-cv-00338-RWT, 71 in 8:09-cv-02980-RWT, 59 in 8:09-cv-03310-RWT, 47 in 8:11-cv-02635-RWT, 60 in 8:09-cv-03314-RWT, 66 in 8:09-cv-03316-RWT, 60 in 8:10-cv-00389-RWT, 71 in 8:09-cv-02745-RWT, 21 in 8:15-cv-03836-RWT, 67 in 8:09-cv-02986-RWT, 60 in 8:09-cv-03309-RWT, 70 in 8:09-cv-02987-RWT, 71 in 8:09-cv-02985-RWT, 59 in 8:11-cv-00337-RWT) MOTION Clarify and Modify Certain Deadlines in Case Management Order filed by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM ORDER re DSS Filings; Setting date for telephone status conference on March 23, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 3/18/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION Clarify and Modify Certain Deadlines in Case Management Order by Brown & Root Services, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc. Responses due by 4/4/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting (380) Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part (381) KBR's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 3/3/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(c/m 03/04/2016 bus, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel Compliance with CMO by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC Responses due by 3/21/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
March 1, 2016 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT of Defendants by Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ON JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY denying 303 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 330 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 361 Motion for Discovery; granting 365 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting 371 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting 372 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 2/8/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(aos, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/21/2016 (aos, Deputy Clerk). (Originally Filed on 2/8/2016, ECF 374 ]
February 5, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE by Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings LLC, KBR Holdings LLC, KBR Inc., KBR Technical Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc, KBR, Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc, KBR Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Halliburton, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc, Kellogg. Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root LLC, KBR Group Holdings, LLC, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root Service, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root, LLC, Haliburton Company, Halliburton Company, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT SERVICES INC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown and Root, LLC, Kellogg, Brown and Root Services, Inc., Halliburton Co, Kellogg Brown & Root Svc Inc, Does, Kellog Brown and Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown and Root Services Inc, KBR, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Does 1 through 20, Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellog Brown & Root LLC Status Update re DSS Issues Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Kies, Marianne)
January 19, 2016 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re (361 in 8:09-md-02083-RWT) MOTION for Discovery and Modifications to the CMO filed by Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc.. Replies due by 2/5/2016. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
January 11, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE by Brown & Root Services, DII Industries, LLC, Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., KBR Group Holdings, LLC, KBR Holdings, LLC, KBR Technical Services, Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Inc, Kellogg, Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg, Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg, Brown & Root Services, Inc. of Filing Proposed Case Management Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed CMO on Jurisdictional Discovery)Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 302 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess pages; staying 303 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Balad; granting 305 Defendants' Motion to Seal Exhibits P, Q, and S to Statement of Facts in Support of Balad Summary Judgment Motion; denying as moot 318 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting 323 Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Maurice A. Callue, Charlene Chisolm, Damien Moore, Robert E. Wies, and Michael Williams; granting 328 Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Relief; staying 330 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike; granting 344 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Exhibits 13, 19, 20, 21, 22, 31, and 33 to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to KBR's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; vacating paragraph III of 340 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 12/23/2015. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(bus, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2015 Filing 13 REPLY in Support in Request for Conference Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel) Modified on 12/23/2015 to correct title (rss, Deputy Clerk).
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM/ORDER scheduling a hearing for December 23, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2C. Signed by Judge Roger W. Titus on 12/21/2015. Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(bus, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2015 Filing 11 Request for Conference Associated Cases: 8:09-md-02083-RWT et al.(Russell, Daniel)
December 18, 2015 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:15-cv-01024. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 9, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 15, 2015 Case transferred electronically to the District of Maryland. CASE CLOSED (mdb)
December 15, 2015 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - (CTO-18). Case transferred to the District Court of Maryland re MDL No. 2083. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffrey N. Luthi on 12/15/2015. (mdb)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #8 Stipulation and Proposed Order Staying Case. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/15/2015. (mdb)
December 10, 2015 Filing 8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying Case by Halliburton Company, KBR Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 12/15/2015 (mdb).
November 19, 2015 Filing 7 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Pollock, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, William Myron Henderson, Brandy E. Broadbent, William Magee, Michael S. Eddy, Robin A. Carr, James Robert Sandefur, Lauren Carol Price, Thomas W. Burns, Gordon Allen Ward, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr, Justin M. Faircloth, Juan Lugo, Cory Orlando McGill, Rigo A. Gonzalez, Bradley Doyle, Hanna P. Nissan, Jon Harding Mason, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr, Ervin L. Walker, Ronald Perry Sharp, Patti J. Anderson, Thomas S. Edwards, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Julio Pipino Walton, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Daniel Martin Jasoni, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Jason L. Carmen, Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr, Earnest J. Ellison, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Neal Mark Sutherland, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Anthony Brett Ogden, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Jason William Smith, Howard Leon Slade, Philip Lam, Clint Allen Blankenship, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Tanya Quincy, Michael Ray Fields, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr, James Cuthbert Midgett, James Eric Kelley, Bruce L. Reges, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Bryan L. Stevens, Kristin Southwell, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr, Larry Haynes, Jimmy Dwayne Williams, Shawn K. McLeod, Jason D. Farquharson, Nathan P. Turnock, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Rahman A. McKinnon, Tommy L. Fullen, Bonnie Dunlop, Rowena L. Darvin, Joseph Edward Devall, Tony L. Wright, Sr., Michael S. Delborrell, Anthony L. Arrington, Aundrea M. Hunt, Scott Allan Christie, Kevin L. Woodrum, Tee Jay Burr, Richard D. Celia, Stephen Randall Keith, Michael Leonard Farley, Steven S. Richardson, Connie G. Conley, Clarence William Wickham, Dennis H. Budd, Debora J. Pfaff, Nathan T. Meidl, Ricky L. Turner, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr, Calvin Priest, Jody Lee Piercy, Julian K. Jones, Simon Allen Wade, Erik J. Burch, David M. Swan, Richard Alan Hardison, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Jeffrey A. Meo, Leon J. Alexander, George Keys, Jr, Stepheny Gupton, Shawn E. Strout, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Wanda N. Jackson, Daniel R. Reyes, Laura J. Nowlin, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Ryan Martin DeLong, Charles Raymond Riippi, Reginald Fleming, Jr, Michael A. Cranfill, Clifford Yarbrough, Michael Lee Lowe, Dennis A. Blanchard, John David Fielder, Ronald Lee Frisby, Steven C. Zimmerman, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Arthur Whiteside, Kole Welsh, Trevor G. Ennis, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Victor M. Rivera, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Charles Lee, Bruce G. Laureiro, Ryan V. Collamore, Jose C. Roque, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Michelle A. Johnson, Bryan Hamilton, Carl Orlando, Murrill L. McLean, Alexander Menkes, Daniel Lee Davis, James Corey Ellis, Timothy Steven Parke, James Preston Potter, Jr., Reginald J. Belton, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr, Napolean L. Stafford, Julie Baron-Mannix, William Emmett White, David B. Swaney, Raphael A. Zamora, Donald P. Worrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Fayiz Nalu, Michael D. Kusek, Leonard Goodson, III, Varita V. Quincy, Rene L. Wilson, Kenley Feazell, Brian David Murphy, Ronnal Womack, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Theodore J. Bill, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Marek M. Sipko, George L. Watson III, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Justin Acosta, Michael W. Carr, Blaine S. Child, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr, Kenon L. Burns, Carter Charles Ruff, Gregory C. Skyles, Edward B. Weibl, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr, Andrea M. Caston, Daniel R. Kearney, Chad Robert Read, Karl Malinski Gibbs, Scott H. Stradley, Thomas K. Jones, Edward Leo Ferguson, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr, Hobart P. Saunders, Clyde Richard Holder, David F. Happle, Francisco Araque, Larry Baker, Kathleen S. Coy, Damian L Smith, Michael Daniel Banks, David W. Kirkland, Michael Farmer, Troy Thomas, Daniel B. Schultz, John Alan Bacon, Willie J. Mitchell, David F. Bryden, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael L. Madigan, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Brandon Christopher Johnston, Jamar Ham, Daniel M. Robshaw, Cliburn Lane, Jr, Leonard Ray Cheek, James Edward Miller, Christine Osorio, Sean M. Ladd, Jason B. Martin, John G. Duerr, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Micky Doto, Jason Paul Hatfield, Jacob Whetstone, Daniel E. Valentine, David B. Whaling, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Cassandra D. Eusery, James Austin Fisher, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Thomas K. Oleson, Derrick D. Clark, Gregory J. Pietz, Robert Wagenaar, Anthony Trinidad, Ozane Jackson, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Andrew Michael Booth, Daniel Maestas, Jonathan Medina, Anterian D. Johnson, James E. Kirk, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Tony Williams, Edwin Steele, Robert P. Busse, John L. Henderson, Samuel Nieves, Michael A. Griley, Jr, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr, James Robin, Craig Belanger, Teddric O'Neal Walker, David P. Staffa, Frederick D. McCollum, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Frank Earl Braxton, James Hershel Hudson, III, Brad L. Fruhling, Tracy Lemar Smith, Paul G. Jones, Michael A. Northup, Brian Earl Easley, Wade Jacobson, Julio A. Apodaca, Charles J. Lowery, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Brian Keith Lloyd, Shawn R. Devaney, Edwin Todd Turpin, William G. Cardwell, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr, Azariah Smith, Jr., Robert L. Williams, Erik D. Upham, Amanda J. Engen, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., Theta A. Olson, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, John Ernest Carlson, Suzanne M. Speight, Paul A. Richmond, Robert William Paxton, Brittany J. Davis, Milton M. Reynolds, David John Smith, Belinda M. Williams, Steven Wayne Holley, Michael A. Grochowski, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Robert Christopher Elesky, Mary A. Mickens, Blain L. Chambers, Timothy Donald Fendley, Tom Lee Gallagher, Christopher R. Simmons, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Paul Anthony Jones, Karen M. Gharst, Tai Porter, Mark A. Hill, Malone W. Davis, Keith R. Menzer, Mitchell P. Gill, Jesse N. Davidson, Michael L. Songy, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Michael Lee Maynard, Leonard Ritums, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Brian K. Bower, Tracy L. Asher, Alan Austin Mays, Johnnie F. Bines, Christopher T. Thornhill, Bryan Keith Keese, Michael P. Gibson, Jarrod C. Hall, Brenda M. O'Neal, David Brian DeLuca, Anthony K. Steward, Michael L. Caldwell, William O. Roark III, Christopher S. Henrikson, Rachael Brown, Terry D. Evans, Rodney W. Meece, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr, Roland David Schulz, Michael W. Hafke, Angela Vanette Barnes, Timothy M. Murray, Michael Christopher Stanco, Milan B. Thakkar, Wayne Rodriguez, Michael A. LeBlanc, Eric Jaeger, Richard J. Nicholls, Richard D. Rice, Charles J. Barnes, Paul R. Vadney, Michele A. Pearce, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Kori L. Willis, James R. Bates, Michael J. Kidder, Patrick C. Mondragon, Brandi L. Benson, Omowunmi Martins, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, Franklin O. Snow, Travis M. Bassett, William James Heard, David Allen Jones, II, Audrey S. Perry, Jason R. Bills, Eric B. McLendon, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Craig J. Daniel, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Alan K. Bridgewater, Sami Juma, Ryan L. Attar, Ronald Layne Smith, Michael E. Zundle, Bruce R. Chaplin, Robin Kruskol, Eric Bradley Gann, Matthew K. Ashworth, Andrew E. Coussens, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Jesse Baker, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Terry Salazar, Jennifer L. Downes, Carrie C. Gallagher, Ernest Richard Roth, Christina L. Lee, David A. Montgomery, Allison Mariko Hill, Richard Michael Clemes, Mikel Harper, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr, Edwin Keith, Sr, Dale Ford, Jeremen Sandoval, Gregory D. Parker, Richard P. Hamilton, Amanda G. Miller, John Albert McDonald, Tommy R. Reddick, Phillip A. Anderson, Andre Demon Glenn, Dennis E. McMullen, Shameran Youkhana, Travis Adams, John R. Fudala, Jeffrey S. Church, Thomas Andersen, Robert Lippolis, Scott D. Bailey, Everette D. Avery, Jr, Timothy J. Watson, Perry A. Cross, Jr, Lewis Palmer, Robert A. Dreyfus, Craig D. Fillingane. Halliburton Company served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/10/2015. (Keener, Carmella)
November 19, 2015 Filing 6 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Pollock, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, William Myron Henderson, Brandy E. Broadbent, William Magee, Michael S. Eddy, Robin A. Carr, James Robert Sandefur, Lauren Carol Price, Thomas W. Burns, Gordon Allen Ward, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr, Justin M. Faircloth, Juan Lugo, Cory Orlando McGill, Rigo A. Gonzalez, Bradley Doyle, Hanna P. Nissan, Jon Harding Mason, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr, Ervin L. Walker, Ronald Perry Sharp, Patti J. Anderson, Thomas S. Edwards, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Julio Pipino Walton, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Daniel Martin Jasoni, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Jason L. Carmen, Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr, Earnest J. Ellison, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Neal Mark Sutherland, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Anthony Brett Ogden, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Jason William Smith, Howard Leon Slade, Philip Lam, Clint Allen Blankenship, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Tanya Quincy, Michael Ray Fields, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr, James Cuthbert Midgett, James Eric Kelley, Bruce L. Reges, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Bryan L. Stevens, Kristin Southwell, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr, Larry Haynes, Jimmy Dwayne Williams, Shawn K. McLeod, Jason D. Farquharson, Nathan P. Turnock, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Rahman A. McKinnon, Tommy L. Fullen, Bonnie Dunlop, Rowena L. Darvin, Joseph Edward Devall, Tony L. Wright, Sr., Michael S. Delborrell, Anthony L. Arrington, Aundrea M. Hunt, Scott Allan Christie, Kevin L. Woodrum, Tee Jay Burr, Richard D. Celia, Stephen Randall Keith, Michael Leonard Farley, Steven S. Richardson, Connie G. Conley, Clarence William Wickham, Dennis H. Budd, Debora J. Pfaff, Nathan T. Meidl, Ricky L. Turner, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr, Calvin Priest, Jody Lee Piercy, Julian K. Jones, Simon Allen Wade, Erik J. Burch, David M. Swan, Richard Alan Hardison, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Jeffrey A. Meo, Leon J. Alexander, George Keys, Jr, Stepheny Gupton, Shawn E. Strout, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Wanda N. Jackson, Daniel R. Reyes, Laura J. Nowlin, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Ryan Martin DeLong, Charles Raymond Riippi, Reginald Fleming, Jr, Michael A. Cranfill, Clifford Yarbrough, Michael Lee Lowe, Dennis A. Blanchard, John David Fielder, Ronald Lee Frisby, Steven C. Zimmerman, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Arthur Whiteside, Kole Welsh, Trevor G. Ennis, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Victor M. Rivera, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Charles Lee, Bruce G. Laureiro, Ryan V. Collamore, Jose C. Roque, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Michelle A. Johnson, Bryan Hamilton, Carl Orlando, Murrill L. McLean, Alexander Menkes, Daniel Lee Davis, James Corey Ellis, Timothy Steven Parke, James Preston Potter, Jr., Reginald J. Belton, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr, Napolean L. Stafford, Julie Baron-Mannix, William Emmett White, David B. Swaney, Raphael A. Zamora, Donald P. Worrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Fayiz Nalu, Michael D. Kusek, Leonard Goodson, III, Varita V. Quincy, Rene L. Wilson, Kenley Feazell, Brian David Murphy, Ronnal Womack, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Theodore J. Bill, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Marek M. Sipko, George L. Watson III, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Justin Acosta, Michael W. Carr, Blaine S. Child, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr, Kenon L. Burns, Carter Charles Ruff, Gregory C. Skyles, Edward B. Weibl, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr, Andrea M. Caston, Daniel R. Kearney, Chad Robert Read, Karl Malinski Gibbs, Scott H. Stradley, Thomas K. Jones, Edward Leo Ferguson, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr, Hobart P. Saunders, Clyde Richard Holder, David F. Happle, Francisco Araque, Larry Baker, Kathleen S. Coy, Damian L Smith, Michael Daniel Banks, David W. Kirkland, Michael Farmer, Troy Thomas, Daniel B. Schultz, John Alan Bacon, Willie J. Mitchell, David F. Bryden, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael L. Madigan, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Brandon Christopher Johnston, Jamar Ham, Daniel M. Robshaw, Cliburn Lane, Jr, Leonard Ray Cheek, James Edward Miller, Christine Osorio, Sean M. Ladd, Jason B. Martin, John G. Duerr, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Micky Doto, Jason Paul Hatfield, Jacob Whetstone, Daniel E. Valentine, David B. Whaling, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Cassandra D. Eusery, James Austin Fisher, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Thomas K. Oleson, Derrick D. Clark, Gregory J. Pietz, Robert Wagenaar, Anthony Trinidad, Ozane Jackson, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Andrew Michael Booth, Daniel Maestas, Jonathan Medina, Anterian D. Johnson, James E. Kirk, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Tony Williams, Edwin Steele, Robert P. Busse, John L. Henderson, Samuel Nieves, Michael A. Griley, Jr, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr, James Robin, Craig Belanger, Teddric O'Neal Walker, David P. Staffa, Frederick D. McCollum, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Frank Earl Braxton, James Hershel Hudson, III, Brad L. Fruhling, Tracy Lemar Smith, Paul G. Jones, Michael A. Northup, Brian Earl Easley, Wade Jacobson, Julio A. Apodaca, Charles J. Lowery, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Brian Keith Lloyd, Shawn R. Devaney, Edwin Todd Turpin, William G. Cardwell, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr, Azariah Smith, Jr., Robert L. Williams, Erik D. Upham, Amanda J. Engen, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., Theta A. Olson, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, John Ernest Carlson, Suzanne M. Speight, Paul A. Richmond, Robert William Paxton, Brittany J. Davis, Milton M. Reynolds, David John Smith, Belinda M. Williams, Steven Wayne Holley, Michael A. Grochowski, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Robert Christopher Elesky, Mary A. Mickens, Blain L. Chambers, Timothy Donald Fendley, Tom Lee Gallagher, Christopher R. Simmons, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Paul Anthony Jones, Karen M. Gharst, Tai Porter, Mark A. Hill, Malone W. Davis, Keith R. Menzer, Mitchell P. Gill, Jesse N. Davidson, Michael L. Songy, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Michael Lee Maynard, Leonard Ritums, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Brian K. Bower, Tracy L. Asher, Alan Austin Mays, Johnnie F. Bines, Christopher T. Thornhill, Bryan Keith Keese, Michael P. Gibson, Jarrod C. Hall, Brenda M. O'Neal, David Brian DeLuca, Anthony K. Steward, Michael L. Caldwell, William O. Roark III, Christopher S. Henrikson, Rachael Brown, Terry D. Evans, Rodney W. Meece, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr, Roland David Schulz, Michael W. Hafke, Angela Vanette Barnes, Timothy M. Murray, Michael Christopher Stanco, Milan B. Thakkar, Wayne Rodriguez, Michael A. LeBlanc, Eric Jaeger, Richard J. Nicholls, Richard D. Rice, Charles J. Barnes, Paul R. Vadney, Michele A. Pearce, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Kori L. Willis, James R. Bates, Michael J. Kidder, Patrick C. Mondragon, Brandi L. Benson, Omowunmi Martins, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, Franklin O. Snow, Travis M. Bassett, William James Heard, David Allen Jones, II, Audrey S. Perry, Jason R. Bills, Eric B. McLendon, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Craig J. Daniel, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Alan K. Bridgewater, Sami Juma, Ryan L. Attar, Ronald Layne Smith, Michael E. Zundle, Bruce R. Chaplin, Robin Kruskol, Eric Bradley Gann, Matthew K. Ashworth, Andrew E. Coussens, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Jesse Baker, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Terry Salazar, Jennifer L. Downes, Carrie C. Gallagher, Ernest Richard Roth, Christina L. Lee, David A. Montgomery, Allison Mariko Hill, Richard Michael Clemes, Mikel Harper, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr, Edwin Keith, Sr, Dale Ford, Jeremen Sandoval, Gregory D. Parker, Richard P. Hamilton, Amanda G. Miller, John Albert McDonald, Tommy R. Reddick, Phillip A. Anderson, Andre Demon Glenn, Dennis E. McMullen, Shameran Youkhana, Travis Adams, John R. Fudala, Jeffrey S. Church, Thomas Andersen, Robert Lippolis, Scott D. Bailey, Everette D. Avery, Jr, Timothy J. Watson, Perry A. Cross, Jr, Lewis Palmer, Robert A. Dreyfus, Craig D. Fillingane. Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc. served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/10/2015. (Keener, Carmella)
November 19, 2015 Filing 5 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Pollock, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, William Myron Henderson, Brandy E. Broadbent, William Magee, Michael S. Eddy, Robin A. Carr, James Robert Sandefur, Lauren Carol Price, Thomas W. Burns, Gordon Allen Ward, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr, Justin M. Faircloth, Juan Lugo, Cory Orlando McGill, Rigo A. Gonzalez, Bradley Doyle, Hanna P. Nissan, Jon Harding Mason, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr, Ervin L. Walker, Ronald Perry Sharp, Patti J. Anderson, Thomas S. Edwards, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Julio Pipino Walton, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Daniel Martin Jasoni, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Jason L. Carmen, Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr, Earnest J. Ellison, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Neal Mark Sutherland, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Anthony Brett Ogden, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Jason William Smith, Howard Leon Slade, Philip Lam, Clint Allen Blankenship, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Tanya Quincy, Michael Ray Fields, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr, James Cuthbert Midgett, James Eric Kelley, Bruce L. Reges, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Bryan L. Stevens, Kristin Southwell, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr, Larry Haynes, Jimmy Dwayne Williams, Shawn K. McLeod, Jason D. Farquharson, Nathan P. Turnock, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Rahman A. McKinnon, Tommy L. Fullen, Bonnie Dunlop, Rowena L. Darvin, Joseph Edward Devall, Tony L. Wright, Sr., Michael S. Delborrell, Anthony L. Arrington, Aundrea M. Hunt, Scott Allan Christie, Kevin L. Woodrum, Tee Jay Burr, Richard D. Celia, Stephen Randall Keith, Michael Leonard Farley, Steven S. Richardson, Connie G. Conley, Clarence William Wickham, Dennis H. Budd, Debora J. Pfaff, Nathan T. Meidl, Ricky L. Turner, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr, Calvin Priest, Jody Lee Piercy, Julian K. Jones, Simon Allen Wade, Erik J. Burch, David M. Swan, Richard Alan Hardison, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Jeffrey A. Meo, Leon J. Alexander, George Keys, Jr, Stepheny Gupton, Shawn E. Strout, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Wanda N. Jackson, Daniel R. Reyes, Laura J. Nowlin, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Ryan Martin DeLong, Charles Raymond Riippi, Reginald Fleming, Jr, Michael A. Cranfill, Clifford Yarbrough, Michael Lee Lowe, Dennis A. Blanchard, John David Fielder, Ronald Lee Frisby, Steven C. Zimmerman, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Arthur Whiteside, Kole Welsh, Trevor G. Ennis, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Victor M. Rivera, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Charles Lee, Bruce G. Laureiro, Ryan V. Collamore, Jose C. Roque, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Michelle A. Johnson, Bryan Hamilton, Carl Orlando, Murrill L. McLean, Alexander Menkes, Daniel Lee Davis, James Corey Ellis, Timothy Steven Parke, James Preston Potter, Jr., Reginald J. Belton, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr, Napolean L. Stafford, Julie Baron-Mannix, William Emmett White, David B. Swaney, Raphael A. Zamora, Donald P. Worrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Fayiz Nalu, Michael D. Kusek, Leonard Goodson, III, Varita V. Quincy, Rene L. Wilson, Kenley Feazell, Brian David Murphy, Ronnal Womack, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Theodore J. Bill, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Marek M. Sipko, George L. Watson III, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Justin Acosta, Michael W. Carr, Blaine S. Child, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr, Kenon L. Burns, Carter Charles Ruff, Gregory C. Skyles, Edward B. Weibl, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr, Andrea M. Caston, Daniel R. Kearney, Chad Robert Read, Karl Malinski Gibbs, Scott H. Stradley, Thomas K. Jones, Edward Leo Ferguson, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr, Hobart P. Saunders, Clyde Richard Holder, David F. Happle, Francisco Araque, Larry Baker, Kathleen S. Coy, Damian L Smith, Michael Daniel Banks, David W. Kirkland, Michael Farmer, Troy Thomas, Daniel B. Schultz, John Alan Bacon, Willie J. Mitchell, David F. Bryden, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael L. Madigan, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Brandon Christopher Johnston, Jamar Ham, Daniel M. Robshaw, Cliburn Lane, Jr, Leonard Ray Cheek, James Edward Miller, Christine Osorio, Sean M. Ladd, Jason B. Martin, John G. Duerr, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Micky Doto, Jason Paul Hatfield, Jacob Whetstone, Daniel E. Valentine, David B. Whaling, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Cassandra D. Eusery, James Austin Fisher, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Thomas K. Oleson, Derrick D. Clark, Gregory J. Pietz, Robert Wagenaar, Anthony Trinidad, Ozane Jackson, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Andrew Michael Booth, Daniel Maestas, Jonathan Medina, Anterian D. Johnson, James E. Kirk, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Tony Williams, Edwin Steele, Robert P. Busse, John L. Henderson, Samuel Nieves, Michael A. Griley, Jr, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr, James Robin, Craig Belanger, Teddric O'Neal Walker, David P. Staffa, Frederick D. McCollum, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Frank Earl Braxton, James Hershel Hudson, III, Brad L. Fruhling, Tracy Lemar Smith, Paul G. Jones, Michael A. Northup, Brian Earl Easley, Wade Jacobson, Julio A. Apodaca, Charles J. Lowery, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Brian Keith Lloyd, Shawn R. Devaney, Edwin Todd Turpin, William G. Cardwell, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr, Azariah Smith, Jr., Robert L. Williams, Erik D. Upham, Amanda J. Engen, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., Theta A. Olson, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, John Ernest Carlson, Suzanne M. Speight, Paul A. Richmond, Robert William Paxton, Brittany J. Davis, Milton M. Reynolds, David John Smith, Belinda M. Williams, Steven Wayne Holley, Michael A. Grochowski, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Robert Christopher Elesky, Mary A. Mickens, Blain L. Chambers, Timothy Donald Fendley, Tom Lee Gallagher, Christopher R. Simmons, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Paul Anthony Jones, Karen M. Gharst, Tai Porter, Mark A. Hill, Malone W. Davis, Keith R. Menzer, Mitchell P. Gill, Jesse N. Davidson, Michael L. Songy, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Michael Lee Maynard, Leonard Ritums, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Brian K. Bower, Tracy L. Asher, Alan Austin Mays, Johnnie F. Bines, Christopher T. Thornhill, Bryan Keith Keese, Michael P. Gibson, Jarrod C. Hall, Brenda M. O'Neal, David Brian DeLuca, Anthony K. Steward, Michael L. Caldwell, William O. Roark III, Christopher S. Henrikson, Rachael Brown, Terry D. Evans, Rodney W. Meece, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr, Roland David Schulz, Michael W. Hafke, Angela Vanette Barnes, Timothy M. Murray, Michael Christopher Stanco, Milan B. Thakkar, Wayne Rodriguez, Michael A. LeBlanc, Eric Jaeger, Richard J. Nicholls, Richard D. Rice, Charles J. Barnes, Paul R. Vadney, Michele A. Pearce, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Kori L. Willis, James R. Bates, Michael J. Kidder, Patrick C. Mondragon, Brandi L. Benson, Omowunmi Martins, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, Franklin O. Snow, Travis M. Bassett, William James Heard, David Allen Jones, II, Audrey S. Perry, Jason R. Bills, Eric B. McLendon, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Craig J. Daniel, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Alan K. Bridgewater, Sami Juma, Ryan L. Attar, Ronald Layne Smith, Michael E. Zundle, Bruce R. Chaplin, Robin Kruskol, Eric Bradley Gann, Matthew K. Ashworth, Andrew E. Coussens, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Jesse Baker, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Terry Salazar, Jennifer L. Downes, Carrie C. Gallagher, Ernest Richard Roth, Christina L. Lee, David A. Montgomery, Allison Mariko Hill, Richard Michael Clemes, Mikel Harper, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr, Edwin Keith, Sr, Dale Ford, Jeremen Sandoval, Gregory D. Parker, Richard P. Hamilton, Amanda G. Miller, John Albert McDonald, Tommy R. Reddick, Phillip A. Anderson, Andre Demon Glenn, Dennis E. McMullen, Shameran Youkhana, Travis Adams, John R. Fudala, Jeffrey S. Church, Thomas Andersen, Robert Lippolis, Scott D. Bailey, Everette D. Avery, Jr, Timothy J. Watson, Perry A. Cross, Jr, Lewis Palmer, Robert A. Dreyfus, Craig D. Fillingane. KBR, Inc. served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/10/2015. (Keener, Carmella)
November 19, 2015 Filing 4 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Pollock, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, William Myron Henderson, Brandy E. Broadbent, William Magee, Michael S. Eddy, Robin A. Carr, James Robert Sandefur, Lauren Carol Price, Thomas W. Burns, Gordon Allen Ward, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr, Justin M. Faircloth, Juan Lugo, Cory Orlando McGill, Rigo A. Gonzalez, Bradley Doyle, Hanna P. Nissan, Jon Harding Mason, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr, Ervin L. Walker, Ronald Perry Sharp, Patti J. Anderson, Thomas S. Edwards, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Julio Pipino Walton, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Daniel Martin Jasoni, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Jason L. Carmen, Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr, Earnest J. Ellison, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Neal Mark Sutherland, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Anthony Brett Ogden, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Jason William Smith, Howard Leon Slade, Philip Lam, Clint Allen Blankenship, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Tanya Quincy, Michael Ray Fields, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr, James Cuthbert Midgett, James Eric Kelley, Bruce L. Reges, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Bryan L. Stevens, Kristin Southwell, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr, Larry Haynes, Jimmy Dwayne Williams, Shawn K. McLeod, Jason D. Farquharson, Nathan P. Turnock, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Rahman A. McKinnon, Tommy L. Fullen, Bonnie Dunlop, Rowena L. Darvin, Joseph Edward Devall, Tony L. Wright, Sr., Michael S. Delborrell, Anthony L. Arrington, Aundrea M. Hunt, Scott Allan Christie, Kevin L. Woodrum, Tee Jay Burr, Richard D. Celia, Stephen Randall Keith, Michael Leonard Farley, Steven S. Richardson, Connie G. Conley, Clarence William Wickham, Dennis H. Budd, Debora J. Pfaff, Nathan T. Meidl, Ricky L. Turner, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr, Calvin Priest, Jody Lee Piercy, Julian K. Jones, Simon Allen Wade, Erik J. Burch, David M. Swan, Richard Alan Hardison, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Jeffrey A. Meo, Leon J. Alexander, George Keys, Jr, Stepheny Gupton, Shawn E. Strout, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Wanda N. Jackson, Daniel R. Reyes, Laura J. Nowlin, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Ryan Martin DeLong, Charles Raymond Riippi, Reginald Fleming, Jr, Michael A. Cranfill, Clifford Yarbrough, Michael Lee Lowe, Dennis A. Blanchard, John David Fielder, Ronald Lee Frisby, Steven C. Zimmerman, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Arthur Whiteside, Kole Welsh, Trevor G. Ennis, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Victor M. Rivera, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Charles Lee, Bruce G. Laureiro, Ryan V. Collamore, Jose C. Roque, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Michelle A. Johnson, Bryan Hamilton, Carl Orlando, Murrill L. McLean, Alexander Menkes, Daniel Lee Davis, James Corey Ellis, Timothy Steven Parke, James Preston Potter, Jr., Reginald J. Belton, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr, Napolean L. Stafford, Julie Baron-Mannix, William Emmett White, David B. Swaney, Raphael A. Zamora, Donald P. Worrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Fayiz Nalu, Michael D. Kusek, Leonard Goodson, III, Varita V. Quincy, Rene L. Wilson, Kenley Feazell, Brian David Murphy, Ronnal Womack, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Theodore J. Bill, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Marek M. Sipko, George L. Watson III, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Justin Acosta, Michael W. Carr, Blaine S. Child, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr, Kenon L. Burns, Carter Charles Ruff, Gregory C. Skyles, Edward B. Weibl, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr, Andrea M. Caston, Daniel R. Kearney, Chad Robert Read, Karl Malinski Gibbs, Scott H. Stradley, Thomas K. Jones, Edward Leo Ferguson, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr, Hobart P. Saunders, Clyde Richard Holder, David F. Happle, Francisco Araque, Larry Baker, Kathleen S. Coy, Damian L Smith, Michael Daniel Banks, David W. Kirkland, Michael Farmer, Troy Thomas, Daniel B. Schultz, John Alan Bacon, Willie J. Mitchell, David F. Bryden, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael L. Madigan, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Brandon Christopher Johnston, Jamar Ham, Daniel M. Robshaw, Cliburn Lane, Jr, Leonard Ray Cheek, James Edward Miller, Christine Osorio, Sean M. Ladd, Jason B. Martin, John G. Duerr, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Micky Doto, Jason Paul Hatfield, Jacob Whetstone, Daniel E. Valentine, David B. Whaling, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Cassandra D. Eusery, James Austin Fisher, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Thomas K. Oleson, Derrick D. Clark, Gregory J. Pietz, Robert Wagenaar, Anthony Trinidad, Ozane Jackson, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Andrew Michael Booth, Daniel Maestas, Jonathan Medina, Anterian D. Johnson, James E. Kirk, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Tony Williams, Edwin Steele, Robert P. Busse, John L. Henderson, Samuel Nieves, Michael A. Griley, Jr, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr, James Robin, Craig Belanger, Teddric O'Neal Walker, David P. Staffa, Frederick D. McCollum, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Frank Earl Braxton, James Hershel Hudson, III, Brad L. Fruhling, Tracy Lemar Smith, Paul G. Jones, Michael A. Northup, Brian Earl Easley, Wade Jacobson, Julio A. Apodaca, Charles J. Lowery, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Brian Keith Lloyd, Shawn R. Devaney, Edwin Todd Turpin, William G. Cardwell, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr, Azariah Smith, Jr., Robert L. Williams, Erik D. Upham, Amanda J. Engen, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., Theta A. Olson, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, John Ernest Carlson, Suzanne M. Speight, Paul A. Richmond, Robert William Paxton, Brittany J. Davis, Milton M. Reynolds, David John Smith, Belinda M. Williams, Steven Wayne Holley, Michael A. Grochowski, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Robert Christopher Elesky, Mary A. Mickens, Blain L. Chambers, Timothy Donald Fendley, Tom Lee Gallagher, Christopher R. Simmons, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Paul Anthony Jones, Karen M. Gharst, Tai Porter, Mark A. Hill, Malone W. Davis, Keith R. Menzer, Mitchell P. Gill, Jesse N. Davidson, Michael L. Songy, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Michael Lee Maynard, Leonard Ritums, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Brian K. Bower, Tracy L. Asher, Alan Austin Mays, Johnnie F. Bines, Christopher T. Thornhill, Bryan Keith Keese, Michael P. Gibson, Jarrod C. Hall, Brenda M. O'Neal, David Brian DeLuca, Anthony K. Steward, Michael L. Caldwell, William O. Roark III, Christopher S. Henrikson, Rachael Brown, Terry D. Evans, Rodney W. Meece, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr, Roland David Schulz, Michael W. Hafke, Angela Vanette Barnes, Timothy M. Murray, Michael Christopher Stanco, Milan B. Thakkar, Wayne Rodriguez, Michael A. LeBlanc, Eric Jaeger, Richard J. Nicholls, Richard D. Rice, Charles J. Barnes, Paul R. Vadney, Michele A. Pearce, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Kori L. Willis, James R. Bates, Michael J. Kidder, Patrick C. Mondragon, Brandi L. Benson, Omowunmi Martins, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, Franklin O. Snow, Travis M. Bassett, William James Heard, David Allen Jones, II, Audrey S. Perry, Jason R. Bills, Eric B. McLendon, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Craig J. Daniel, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Alan K. Bridgewater, Sami Juma, Ryan L. Attar, Ronald Layne Smith, Michael E. Zundle, Bruce R. Chaplin, Robin Kruskol, Eric Bradley Gann, Matthew K. Ashworth, Andrew E. Coussens, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Jesse Baker, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Terry Salazar, Jennifer L. Downes, Carrie C. Gallagher, Ernest Richard Roth, Christina L. Lee, David A. Montgomery, Allison Mariko Hill, Richard Michael Clemes, Mikel Harper, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr, Edwin Keith, Sr, Dale Ford, Jeremen Sandoval, Gregory D. Parker, Richard P. Hamilton, Amanda G. Miller, John Albert McDonald, Tommy R. Reddick, Phillip A. Anderson, Andre Demon Glenn, Dennis E. McMullen, Shameran Youkhana, Travis Adams, John R. Fudala, Jeffrey S. Church, Thomas Andersen, Robert Lippolis, Scott D. Bailey, Everette D. Avery, Jr, Timothy J. Watson, Perry A. Cross, Jr, Lewis Palmer, Robert A. Dreyfus, Craig D. Fillingane. Kellogg Brown & Root LLC served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/10/2015. (Keener, Carmella)
November 18, 2015 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Halliburton Company, KBR Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc. (rwc)
November 18, 2015 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Halliburton Company, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc., KBR, Inc.- filed by James Pollock, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, William Myron Henderson, Brandy E. Broadbent, William Magee, Michael S. Eddy, Robin A. Carr, James Robert Sandefur, Lauren Carol Price, Thomas W. Burns, Gordon Allen Ward, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr, Justin M. Faircloth, Juan Lugo, Cory Orlando McGill, Rigo A. Gonzalez, Bradley Doyle, Hanna P. Nissan, Jon Harding Mason, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr, Ervin L. Walker, Ronald Perry Sharp, Patti J. Anderson, Thomas S. Edwards, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Julio Pipino Walton, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Daniel Martin Jasoni, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Jason L. Carmen, Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr, Earnest J. Ellison, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Neal Mark Sutherland, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Anthony Brett Ogden, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Jason William Smith, Howard Leon Slade, Philip Lam, Clint Allen Blankenship, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Tanya Quincy, Michael Ray Fields, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr, James Cuthbert Midgett, James Eric Kelley, Bruce L. Reges, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Bryan L. Stevens, Kristin Southwell, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr, Larry Haynes, Jimmy Dwayne Williams, Shawn K. McLeod, Jason D. Farquharson, Nathan P. Turnock, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Rahman A. McKinnon, Tommy L. Fullen, Bonnie Dunlop, Rowena L. Darvin, Joseph Edward Devall, Tony L. Wright, Sr., Michael S. Delborrell, Anthony L. Arrington, Aundrea M. Hunt, Scott Allan Christie, Kevin L. Woodrum, Tee Jay Burr, Richard D. Celia, Stephen Randall Keith, Michael Leonard Farley, Steven S. Richardson, Connie G. Conley, Clarence William Wickham, Dennis H. Budd, Debora J. Pfaff, Nathan T. Meidl, Ricky L. Turner, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr, Calvin Priest, Jody Lee Piercy, Julian K. Jones, Simon Allen Wade, Erik J. Burch, David M. Swan, Richard Alan Hardison, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Jeffrey A. Meo, Leon J. Alexander, George Keys, Jr, Stepheny Gupton, Shawn E. Strout, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Wanda N. Jackson, Daniel R. Reyes, Laura J. Nowlin, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Ryan Martin DeLong, Charles Raymond Riippi, Reginald Fleming, Jr, Michael A. Cranfill, Clifford Yarbrough, Michael Lee Lowe, Dennis A. Blanchard, John David Fielder, Ronald Lee Frisby, Steven C. Zimmerman, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Arthur Whiteside, Kole Welsh, Trevor G. Ennis, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Victor M. Rivera, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Charles Lee, Bruce G. Laureiro, Ryan V. Collamore, Jose C. Roque, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Michelle A. Johnson, Bryan Hamilton, Carl Orlando, Murrill L. McLean, Alexander Menkes, Daniel Lee Davis, James Corey Ellis, Timothy Steven Parke, James Preston Potter, Jr., Reginald J. Belton, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr, Napolean L. Stafford, Julie Baron-Mannix, William Emmett White, David B. Swaney, Raphael A. Zamora, Donald P. Worrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Fayiz Nalu, Michael D. Kusek, Leonard Goodson, III, Varita V. Quincy, Rene L. Wilson, Kenley Feazell, Brian David Murphy, Ronnal Womack, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Theodore J. Bill, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Marek M. Sipko, George L. Watson III, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Justin Acosta, Michael W. Carr, Blaine S. Child, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr, Kenon L. Burns, Carter Charles Ruff, Gregory C. Skyles, Edward B. Weibl, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr, Andrea M. Caston, Daniel R. Kearney, Chad Robert Read, Karl Malinski Gibbs, Scott H. Stradley, Thomas K. Jones, Edward Leo Ferguson, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr, Hobart P. Saunders, Clyde Richard Holder, David F. Happle, Francisco Araque, Larry Baker, Kathleen S. Coy, Damian L Smith, Michael Daniel Banks, David W. Kirkland, Michael Farmer, Troy Thomas, Daniel B. Schultz, John Alan Bacon, Willie J. Mitchell, David F. Bryden, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael L. Madigan, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Brandon Christopher Johnston, Jamar Ham, Daniel M. Robshaw, Cliburn Lane, Jr, Leonard Ray Cheek, James Edward Miller, Christine Osorio, Sean M. Ladd, Jason B. Martin, John G. Duerr, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Micky Doto, Jason Paul Hatfield, Jacob Whetstone, Daniel E. Valentine, David B. Whaling, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Cassandra D. Eusery, James Austin Fisher, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Thomas K. Oleson, Derrick D. Clark, Gregory J. Pietz, Robert Wagenaar, Anthony Trinidad, Ozane Jackson, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Andrew Michael Booth, Daniel Maestas, Jonathan Medina, Anterian D. Johnson, James E. Kirk, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Tony Williams, Edwin Steele, Robert P. Busse, John L. Henderson, Samuel Nieves, Michael A. Griley, Jr, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr, James Robin, Craig Belanger, Teddric O'Neal Walker, David P. Staffa, Frederick D. McCollum, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Frank Earl Braxton, James Hershel Hudson, III, Brad L. Fruhling, Tracy Lemar Smith, Paul G. Jones, Michael A. Northup, Brian Earl Easley, Wade Jacobson, Julio A. Apodaca, Charles J. Lowery, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Brian Keith Lloyd, Shawn R. Devaney, Edwin Todd Turpin, William G. Cardwell, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr, Azariah Smith, Jr., Robert L. Williams, Erik D. Upham, Amanda J. Engen, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., Theta A. Olson, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, John Ernest Carlson, Suzanne M. Speight, Paul A. Richmond, Robert William Paxton, Brittany J. Davis, Milton M. Reynolds, David John Smith, Belinda M. Williams, Steven Wayne Holley, Michael A. Grochowski, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Robert Christopher Elesky, Mary A. Mickens, Blain L. Chambers, Timothy Donald Fendley, Tom Lee Gallagher, Christopher R. Simmons, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Paul Anthony Jones, Karen M. Gharst, Tai Porter, Mark A. Hill, Malone W. Davis, Keith R. Menzer, Mitchell P. Gill, Jesse N. Davidson, Michael L. Songy, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Michael Lee Maynard, Leonard Ritums, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Brian K. Bower, Tracy L. Asher, Alan Austin Mays, Johnnie F. Bines, Christopher T. Thornhill, Bryan Keith Keese, Michael P. Gibson, Jarrod C. Hall, Brenda M. O'Neal, David Brian DeLuca, Anthony K. Steward, Michael L. Caldwell, William O. Roark III, Christopher S. Henrikson, Rachael Brown, Terry D. Evans, Rodney W. Meece, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr, Roland David Schulz, Michael W. Hafke, Angela Vanette Barnes, Timothy M. Murray, Michael Christopher Stanco, Milan B. Thakkar, Wayne Rodriguez, Michael A. LeBlanc, Eric Jaeger, Richard J. Nicholls, Richard D. Rice, Charles J. Barnes, Paul R. Vadney, Michele A. Pearce, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Kori L. Willis, James R. Bates, Michael J. Kidder, Patrick C. Mondragon, Brandi L. Benson, Omowunmi Martins, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, Franklin O. Snow, Travis M. Bassett, William James Heard, David Allen Jones, II, Audrey S. Perry, Jason R. Bills, Eric B. McLendon, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Craig J. Daniel, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Alan K. Bridgewater, Sami Juma, Ryan L. Attar, Ronald Layne Smith, Michael E. Zundle, Bruce R. Chaplin, Robin Kruskol, Eric Bradley Gann, Matthew K. Ashworth, Andrew E. Coussens, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Jesse Baker, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Terry Salazar, Jennifer L. Downes, Carrie C. Gallagher, Ernest Richard Roth, Christina L. Lee, David A. Montgomery, Allison Mariko Hill, Richard Michael Clemes, Mikel Harper, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr, Edwin Keith, Sr, Dale Ford, Jeremen Sandoval, Gregory D. Parker, Richard P. Hamilton, Amanda G. Miller, John Albert McDonald, Tommy R. Reddick, Phillip A. Anderson, Andre Demon Glenn, Dennis E. McMullen, Shameran Youkhana, Travis Adams, John R. Fudala, Jeffrey S. Church, Thomas Andersen, Robert Lippolis, Scott D. Bailey, Everette D. Avery, Jr, Timothy J. Watson, Perry A. Cross, Jr, Lewis Palmer, Robert A. Dreyfus, Craig D. Fillingane.(Keener, Carmella)
November 13, 2015 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to KBR Inc.. (sec)
November 13, 2015 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Halliburton Company on 11/13/2015; KBR Inc. on 11/13/2015; Kellogg Brown & Root LLC on 11/13/2015; Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc. on 11/13/2015. (sec)
November 12, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 5, 2015 No Summons Issued. (klc)
November 5, 2015 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (klc)
November 5, 2015 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Halliburton Company, KBR Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1822213) - filed by Justin Acosta et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta et al v. Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Layne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan C. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald J. Belton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher R. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Michael Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Whetstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Vanette Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel C. Chavez, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie F. Bines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik J. Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell P. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Lee Piercy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Grochowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Edward Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Keith Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Sue Matchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Robert Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigo A. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Orlando McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Brett Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney W. Meece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy-Ann Bellefleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason D. Farquharson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jericho N. Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Kidder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Leo Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Raymond Riippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin L. Woodrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everette D. Avery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian David Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Thomas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Richard Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Keith, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Jean Karl-Forst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Steven Parke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Marie Applewhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Songy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Meo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda J. Engen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raphael A. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozane Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Martin DeLong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence J. Jankowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowena L. Darvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis M. Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Malinski Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad L. Fruhling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Donald Fendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew E. Coussens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest J. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore J. Bill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric B. McLendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Leon Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott H. Stradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick D. McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda N. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason R. Bills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Earl Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G. Cardwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Paul Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Napolean L. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin O. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brian DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan V. Collamore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn E. Strout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Charles Ruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy L. Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean M. Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azariah Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Christopher Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wagenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos J. Martir Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Nicholls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan P. Turnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Dunlop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick C. Mondragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ernest Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Randall Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan T. Meidl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Alan Hardison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse N. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Fudala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hobart P. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik D. Upham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas S. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Fleming, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy E. Broadbent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David F. Bryden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aundrea M. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameran Youkhana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose C. Roque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Martin Jasoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Albert McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura J. Nowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher T. Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kole Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Jeffrey Auer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Gerald Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven C. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Lee Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Zundle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anterian D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliburn Lane, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie G. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Mark Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony K. Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenley Feazell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Edward Devall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William O. Roark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Goodson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Austin Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason William Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Michele Neutzling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Earl Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda M. O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Michael Clemes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sami Juma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Priest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason L. Carmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Benjamen Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Christopher Elesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy L. Fullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Richard Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward B. Weibl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Araque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theta A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy R. Reddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omowunmi Martins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin M. Faircloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Christopher Stanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David P. Staffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig J. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina LeAnn White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Frisby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas K. Oleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland David Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton M. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi L. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Joseph Walrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Maestas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tai Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lynn Nanney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Alexander Horsewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Allen Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary A. Mickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory D. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikel Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cuthbert Midgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Allan Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varita V. Quincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory J. Pietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael DeVincent Amicy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Treymane Waiters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald P. Worrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Belanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanna P. Nissan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason B. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele A. Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan L. Attar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven S. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Harding Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Osorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Westley Westburg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tee Jay Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Emmett White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Carl Hogan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Cranfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malone W. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Lynn Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley K. Kaina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Trinidad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Allen Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Adam Tumlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Whiteside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lemar Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Eric Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Danyelle Tapley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marek M. Sipko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra D. Eusery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Skyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne M. Speight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie J. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert William Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Keys, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor G. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandi Christine Golden-Vest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew K. Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William James Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Edmundo Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milan B. Thakkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey S. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Southwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Michael O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina L. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahman A. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fayiz Nalu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard P. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan K. Bridgewater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kryste Swanzetta Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Quincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Preston Potter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Demon Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan L. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce L. Reges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Delborrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lee Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora J. Pfaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre O'Dell Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis A. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M. Gharst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio A. Apodaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar Ham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kori L. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Leonard Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher S. Henrikson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alan Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bradley Gann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremen Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Nathan Perusse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky L. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Pipino Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick D. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A. Elsenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |