Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. v. International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99
Plaintiff: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99
Case Number: 8:2017cv00170
Filed: January 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 07/24/17, before Judge Peter J. Messitte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Marlene Kerr, Telephone number 301-344-3499. Total number of pages filed: 65. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2017.(mmk, Court Reporter)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINAL ORDER OF JUDGMENT granting (14) Motion by defendant for Summary Judgment; finding as moot (15) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint ; denying (23) Motion by Plaintiff for Summary Judgment in case 8:17-cv-00170-PJM ; directing clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/1/2017. Associated Cases: 8:17-cv-00170-PJM, 8:17-cv-00407-PJM(aos, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2017 Filing 29 RESPONSE re #28 Response to Kaiser's Memorandum Regarding the Proposed Court Order filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99.(Paul, Robert)
July 31, 2017 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #27 Notice (Other) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc..(Morell, Rafael)
July 31, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99 Final Order and Judgment (Paul, Robert)
July 24, 2017 Filing 26 Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2017 re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99 before Judge Peter J. Messitte.(Court Reporter: Marlene Kerr - 4C) (jmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2017 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Morell, Rafael)
May 30, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99.(Paul, Robert)
May 18, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 SJ Mem Ex 1, #4 SJ Mem Ex 2, #5 SJ Mem Ex 3)(Morell, Rafael)
April 21, 2017 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99.(Paul, Robert)
April 13, 2017 Filing 21 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTIONS HEARING and advising counsel/parties of record that, due to a conflict in the Court calendar, the MOTIONS HEARING scheduled before Judge Peter J. Messitte on Monday, July 10, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. has been RESCHEDULED to Monday, July 24, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Courtroom To Be Determined). (rass, Chambers)
April 11, 2017 Filing 20 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF MOTIONS HEARING and confirming that argument on #14 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment will be heard before Judge Peter J. Messitte on Monday, July 10, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Courtroom To Be Determined). The parties will be allotted one and one-half hours for total argument. Counsel should advise in writing immediately if they expect oral argument to exceed the allotted time frame. PLEASE NOTE, however, that this motion may be decided on the pleadings before the date scheduled for argument. If so, you will be notified sufficiently in advance of that date. PLEASE ALSO NOTE: Counsel should bring copies for both the Court and opposing counsel of the principal cases on which they intend to rely during oral argument. Please also highlight the appropriate text. (rass, Chambers)
April 10, 2017 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Morell, Rafael)
March 28, 2017 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99 (Paul, Robert)
March 28, 2017 Deficiency Notice as to International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99 -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/4/2017 (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2017 Filing 17 Answer to Complaint filed in CA 8:17-CV-00407-PJM by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. (Morell, Rafael) Modified on 3/28/2017 (aos, Deputy Clerk).
March 28, 2017 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re (1 in 8:17-cv-00407-PJM) Complaint, filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time)(Paul, Robert)
March 27, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re (1 in 8:17-cv-00407-PJM) Complaint, by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:17-cv-00170-PJM, 8:17-cv-00407-PJM(Morell, Rafael)
March 27, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99 (Attachments: #1 IUOE L 99 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 ORDER, #3 IUOE L 99 Statement of Material Facts Not In Dispute in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit 1 to Statement of Material Facts, #5 Exhibit 2 to Statement of Material Facts, #6 Exhibit 3 to Statement of Material Facts, #7 Exhibit 4 to Statement of Material Facts, #8 Certificate of Service)(Paul, Robert)
March 27, 2017 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Paul, Robert)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/20/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Paul, Robert)
March 8, 2017 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99 served on 3/7/2015, answer due 3/28/2015.(Morell, Rafael)
March 6, 2017 Filing 9 Summons Issued 21 days as to International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99.(aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 3, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Summons (Morell, Rafael)
March 1, 2017 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #6 Notice (Other) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please use the proper form for proposed summons (AO440) which can be found at the following link http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/sites/mdd/files/forms/AO440_SummonsCivil.pdf and refile using the event Notice (other) and link it back to #1 Complaint. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Summons (Morell, Rafael)
February 15, 2017 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc..(Morell, Rafael)
January 19, 2017 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please refile Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement as corporate affiliations and/or those with financial interest should be entered when the system prompts you do to so.. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2017 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments are missing - Proposed summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed summons to #1 Complaint. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2017 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR-COUNSEL TO REFILE)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. (Morell, Rafael) Modified on 1/19/2017 (aos, Deputy Clerk).
January 18, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6449934.), filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morell, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. v. International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99
Represented By: Robert Edward Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Represented By: Rafael Morell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?