International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99 v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2017cv00407
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL ORDER OF JUDGMENT granting (14) Motion by defendant for Summary Judgment; finding as moot (15) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint ; denying (23) Motion by Plaintiff for Summary Judgment in case 8:17-cv-00170-PJM ; directing clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/1/2017. Associated Cases: 8:17-cv-00170-PJM, 8:17-cv-00407-PJM(aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2017 (FILED IN ERROR) Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/4/2017 (ah4s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/28/2017 (ah4s, Deputy Clerk).
March 28, 2017 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.(Morell, Rafael) Modified on 3/28/2017 (ah4s, Deputy Clerk).
March 27, 2017 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re (1 in 8:17-cv-00407-PJM) Complaint, by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:17-cv-00170-PJM, 8:17-cv-00407-PJM(Morell, Rafael) Modified on 3/28/2017 (ah4s, Deputy Clerk).
March 20, 2017 THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (PJM 17-cv-170). (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/20/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 99 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Paul, Robert)
March 14, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. served on 3/6/2017, answer due 3/27/2017.(Paul, Robert)
February 17, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.(ah4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2017 Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Judge Roger W Titus no longer assigned to the case. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE LABOR-MANAGEMENT RELATIONS ACT AND TO CONFIRM AND ENFORCE ARBITRATION AWARD against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6496687.), filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99-99A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Paul, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99 v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99
Represented By: Robert Edward Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Represented By: Rafael Morell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?