National Association for the Advancement of Colored People et al v. Bureau of the Census et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs National Association for the Advancement of Colored People (NAACP), Prince George's County and others sued the Bureau of the Census alleging that the government's lack of preparation for the 2020 Census will result in a massive undercount of communities of color, thereby diluting their vote and denying them critical federal funds.

Plaintiff: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Prince George's County, Maryland, Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch, Robert E Ross and H. Elizabeth Johnson
Defendant: Bureau of the Census, Ron Jarmin, Wilbur Ross, Donald J. Trump and The United States
Case Number: 8:2018cv00891
Filed: March 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Prince George's
Presiding Judge: Paul W. Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy M. Creelan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7275215.) by H. Elizabeth Johnson, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch, Prince George's County, Maryland, Robert E Ross(Wishnie, Michael)
April 9, 2018 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 13 Notice of Appearance Acknowledgement filed by H. Elizabeth Johnson, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch, Prince George's County, Maryland, Robert E Ross.(Craine, Khyla)
April 7, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Wishnie on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order Granting Petition for Certification of Law Students)(Wishnie, Michael)
April 3, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued 60 days as to Bureau of the Census, Ron Jarmin, Wilbur Ross, The United States, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Khyla Danielle Craine on behalf of National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch (Craine, Khyla)
March 30, 2018 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan Diaz. Directing attorney Jonathan Diaz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2018 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jacob Alderdice. Directing attorney Jacob Alderdice to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2018 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Susan Kohlmann. Directing attorney Susan Kohlmann to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan M. Diaz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7238125.) by H. Elizabeth Johnson, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch, Prince George's County, Maryland, Robert E Ross(Wishnie, Michael)
March 29, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacob D. Alderdice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7238113.) by H. Elizabeth Johnson, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch, Prince George's County, Maryland, Robert E Ross(Wishnie, Michael)
March 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Susan J. Kohlmann (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7238086.) by H. Elizabeth Johnson, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch, Prince George's County, Maryland, Robert E Ross(Wishnie, Michael)
March 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by National Association for the Advancement of Colored People Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Wishnie, Michael)
March 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by H. Elizabeth Johnson, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch, Prince George's County, Maryland, Robert E Ross Proposed Summons (Wishnie, Michael)
March 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by H. Elizabeth Johnson, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch, Prince George's County, Maryland, Robert E Ross re 1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Wishnie, Michael)
March 29, 2018 Filing 3 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/28/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint, filed by National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Prince George's County, Maryland, Robert E Ross, H. Elizabeth Johnson and Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments are missing - Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file the Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons using the civil event Notice (Other) and link the Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons to 1 Complaint. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7233608.), filed by Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch, PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY,MD, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Robert E Ross, H. Elizabeth Johnson.(Wishnie, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People et al v. Bureau of the Census et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: Jacob Alderdice
Represented By: Khyla Danielle Craine
Represented By: Jeremy Creelan
Represented By: Jonathan Diaz
Represented By: Susan Kohlmann
Represented By: Michael J Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince George's County, Maryland
Represented By: Jacob Alderdice
Represented By: Jeremy Creelan
Represented By: Jonathan Diaz
Represented By: Susan Kohlmann
Represented By: Michael J Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince George's County Maryland NAACP Branch
Represented By: Jacob Alderdice
Represented By: Khyla Danielle Craine
Represented By: Jeremy Creelan
Represented By: Jonathan Diaz
Represented By: Susan Kohlmann
Represented By: Michael J Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Ross
Represented By: Jacob Alderdice
Represented By: Jeremy Creelan
Represented By: Jonathan Diaz
Represented By: Susan Kohlmann
Represented By: Michael J Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Jacob Alderdice
Represented By: Jeremy Creelan
Represented By: Jonathan Diaz
Represented By: Susan Kohlmann
Represented By: Michael J Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of the Census
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Jarmin
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Ross
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?