Jackson et al v. Viking Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Foster and Gayl Jackson
Defendant: Supply Network, Inc., The Viking Corporation and Viking Group, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02356
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Charles
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Schedule for the filing of responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/4/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph George Sauder. Attorney Joseph George Sauder will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph G. Sauder (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7531934.) by Tammy Foster, Gayl Jackson(Ulwick, James)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 Correspondence re: stipulation to proposed schedule (Attachments: #1 Attachment Stipulation and Order Regarding Parties' Proposed Schedule)(Ulwick, James)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Supply Network, Inc., The Viking Corporation, Viking Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(aos, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7477196.), filed by Gayl Jackson, Tammy Foster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiffs' Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons - Viking Group, Inc., #3 Summons Proposed Summons - The Viking Corporation, #4 Summons Proposed Summons - Supply Network, Inc.)(Ulwick, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Viking Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supply Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Viking Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Foster
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Joseph George Sauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayl Jackson
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Joseph George Sauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?