Brown v. Intercontinental Capital Group et al

Plaintiff: Sharon Brown
Defendant: Intercontinental Capital Group, Ronnie Solomon, TMS - The Money Store Inc., Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna and Dustin DiMisa
Case Number: 8:2018cv02417
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441la
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2018 33 Featured Case ORDER setting forth the schedule to be followed in this Case as stated during the September 21, 2018 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/21/2018. (c/m 9/21/2018 tds, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2018 32 Featured Case ORDER dismissing with prejudice all Claims against TMS - The Money Store, Inc.; and directing the Clerk to terminate TMS - The Money Store, Inc. as a Defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/21/2018. (c/m 9/21/2018 tds, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2018 31 Case Management Conference held on 9/21/2018 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2018 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant TMS - The Money Source Inc. ONLY by Sharon Brown. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 29 Featured Case ORDER denying #15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/14/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 9/17/18)
September 6, 2018 28 RESPONSE re #23 Answer to Complaint filed by Sharon Brown.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2018 27 NOTICE Rescheduling Case Management Conference for September 21, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (c/m 8/29/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2018 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed in State Court proceeding filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Ronnie Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Abarbanel, Jay)
August 15, 2018 25 NOTICE scheduling a Pre-Motions Conference for September 19, 2018 at 10:00 AM re #22 Notice of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/15/2018. (c/m 08/16/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2018 24 RESPONSE re #16 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Sharon Brown. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2018 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Intercontinental Capital Group.(Abarbanel, Jay)
August 13, 2018 22 Correspondence re: Notice of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 13, 2018 21 STATUS REPORT Statement in Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Ronnie Solomon(Abarbanel, Jay)
August 13, 2018 20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Intercontinental Capital Group (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 9, 2018 19 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/9/2018. (c/m 8/9/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2018 18 Local Rule 103.5(Abarbanel, Jay)
August 9, 2018 17 Removal Notification Letter mailed to Plaintiff (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2018 16 Featured Case Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/9/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2018 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed in State Court proceeding by Sharon Brown (Abarbanel, Jay) Modified on 8/9/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
August 8, 2018 14 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Complaint (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 13 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Certificate of Service (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 12 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Certificate of Service (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 11 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Certificate of Service (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 10 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Summons (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 9 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Notice of New Case Number (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 8 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Scheduling Order - Track 3 (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 7 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference/Pre-Trial Hearing - Track 3 (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 6 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Scheduling Notice and Order of Court - Track 3 (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 5 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Correspondence from State Court Clerk (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 4 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Complaint (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 3 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 2 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Todd Adwar, Jennifer De Modna, Dustin DiMisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Ronnie Solomon Civil Cover Sheet - Federal Court (Abarbanel, Jay)
August 8, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 450924V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7490138), filed by Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc., Dustin DiMisa, Jennifer De Modna, Ronnie Solomon, Todd Adwar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Abarbanel, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Intercontinental Capital Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Capital Group
Represented By: Jay Abarbanel
Represented By: Ira L Oring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Solomon
Represented By: Jay Abarbanel
Represented By: Ira L Oring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMS - The Money Store Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Adwar
Represented By: Jay Abarbanel
Represented By: Ira L Oring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer De Modna
Represented By: Jay Abarbanel
Represented By: Ira L Oring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin DiMisa
Represented By: Jay Abarbanel
Represented By: Ira L Oring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?