United States of America v. Shuler et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Charles Shuler, Thomas & Libowitz, P.A., Greater Baltimore Medical Center, Inc., State of Maryland, Office of the Comptroller of Maryland and Sally Shuler
Case Number: 8:2018cv02493
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sally Shuler.(Frost, Glen)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen E Frost on behalf of Sally Shuler (Frost, Glen)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Sally Shuler served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018.(Wagner, Nelson)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Charles Shuler waiver sent on 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018.(Wagner, Nelson)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Federal Taxes by State of Maryland, Office of the Comptroller of Maryland.(Stephens, Kimberly)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Greater Baltimore Medical Center, Inc. served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018; State of Maryland, Office of the Comptroller of Maryland served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018; Thomas & Libowitz, P.A. served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018.(Wagner, Nelson)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/17/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Greater Baltimore Medical Center, Inc., Charles Shuler, Sally Shuler, State of Maryland, Office of the Comptroller of Maryland and Thomas & Libowitz, P.A.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Federal Taxes against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Deed), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Wagner, Nelson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Shuler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Shuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas & Libowitz, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Baltimore Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland, Office of the Comptroller of Maryland
Represented By: Kimberly Bowden Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Shuler
Represented By: Glen E Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nelson Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?