Fallin v. Zenix Media, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Glen M. Fallin
Defendant: Zenimax Online Studios, LLC. and Zenix Media, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02598
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Glen M. Fallin (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time; filing fee or Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is due on or before October 9, 2018, failure to pay the filing gee of file a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis will result in the dismissal of the Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/24/2018. (c/m 9/25/2018 with forms heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2018 4 Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Order by Glen M. Fallin (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER Granting Plaintiff Twenty-One (21) days from the date of this Order to pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/28/2018. (c/m 8/28/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 2 Featured Case LETTER ORDER regarding the filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/22/2018. (c/m 8/22/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Zenimax Online Studios, LLC., Zenix Media, Inc., filed by Glen M. Fallin.( Originally rec'd 9/5/2017 as an attachment to the Complaint in PWG-17-cv-02580 heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fallin v. Zenix Media, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen M. Fallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenimax Online Studios, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenix Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?