Olymbec USA LLC v. CWFS Insight LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Olymbec USA LLC
Defendant: John Doe Members of Lenox Park B, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., CWFS Insight LLC, Lenox Park A, LLC, John Doe, Brian Tageson, Randolph Wolpert, Victor Gutierrez, Kevin Wodicka, Larry Golinsky, LaSalle Bank National Association, Citigroup Global Markets Realty Corp, Campmark Finance, Inc., PNC Bank National Association, CWFS-REDS LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, Citigroup Commercial Mortgage Trust 2007-C6, Lamar P. Fisher, Lenox Park B, LLC, Isaac Pesin, Fisher Auction Co., Inc., Robert Cherry, John Doe Members of Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, John Doe Members of Lenox Park A,, LLC, John Doe Members of 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, Ronald Schrager, CWCapital Asset Management LLC and Midland Loan Services, Inc.
Interested Party: Donna Russell
Case Number: 8:2018cv02606
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Larry Golinsky, Victor Gutierrez, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Mellott, Christopher)
September 13, 2018 Filing 54 RESPONSE re #49 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Larry Golinsky, Victor Gutierrez, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mellott, Christopher)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #52 Stipulation, filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., CWFS-REDS LLC, Larry Golinsky, CWFS Insight LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Victor Gutierrez, CWCapital Asset Management LLC. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/4/2018. (am2s, Chambers)
September 4, 2018 Filing 52 STIPULATION Parties' Joint Stipulation to Request Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Larry Golinsky, Victor Gutierrez, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(Mellott, Christopher)
August 31, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P Fletcher on behalf of Lamar P. Fisher, Fisher Auction Co., Inc. (Fletcher, Robert)
August 24, 2018 Filing 50 Transfer Notification Letter (Attachments: #1 Transfer Notification Letter to Parties)(c/m 08/24/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/24/2018. (c/m to parties and counsel 08/24/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2018 Filing 48 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 2:18-cv-02059. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting DE #7 Motion to Transfer Venue to USDC for District of Maryland and finding as moot all remaining motions signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 8/20/18. (Fowlkes, John)
April 17, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Mellott on behalf of Larry Golinsky (Mellott, Christopher)
April 16, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss by Larry Golinsky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Larry Golinsky)(Tom, Robert)
April 9, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC of Service of Discovery Responses (Tom, Robert)
March 23, 2018 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 3/23/2018. Both Parties present in Court. Parties updated the Court as to the status of the case. Court will deal with pending Motions & will not enter a scheduling order today. A future court date will be set should the Court determine a hearing date is needed. (Plaintiff: S. Joshua Kahane, Ryan M. Skertich)(Defense: Christopher R. Mellott, Robert F. Tom, Diane M. Comes, Robert L. Crawford - by phone) (Court Reporter Lynn Dudley.) (wrh)
March 22, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Mellott on behalf of Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC (Mellott, Christopher)
March 22, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Mellott on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Mellott, Christopher)
March 21, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(4) and 12(b)(5) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 - Corrected Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 3 - Summons on Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.)(Tom, Robert)
March 20, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Capmark Finance Inc. proposed order submitted (Certain Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Capmark Finance Inc.) filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Tom, Robert)
March 19, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Proposed Joint Scheduling Order proposed order submitted (Certain Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Joint Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support Thereof) filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Tom, Robert)
March 16, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Capmark Finance Inc. proposed order submitted by Olymbec USA LLC. (Kahane, S)
March 16, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Proposed Joint Scheduling Order proposed order submitted by Olymbec USA LLC. (Kahane, S)
March 16, 2018 Filing 35 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Rule 26(f) Planning Report). (Kisber, Zachary)
March 14, 2018 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC's Joinder in Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions and Memorandum in Support Thereof) filed by Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC. (Tom, Robert)
March 14, 2018 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Removing Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion and Meorandum in Support) filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Tom, Robert)
March 7, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Olymbec USA LLC. (Kahane, S)
March 6, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana M. Comes on behalf of Lamar P. Fisher, Fisher Auction Co., Inc. (Comes, Diana)
March 6, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(4) and 12(b)(5) by Lamar P. Fisher, Fisher Auction Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(4) and 12(b)(5), #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Crawford, Robert)
March 6, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Crawford on behalf of Lamar P. Fisher, Fisher Auction Co., Inc. (Crawford, Robert)
March 6, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE by Olymbec USA LLC re #13 MOTION to Withdraw the Federal RICO Claim and Remand Plaintiff's State Law Claims to Part II of Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee proposed order submitted of Filing Proposed Third Amended Verified Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Third Amended Verified Complaint)(Kahane, S)
March 5, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Stay All Filing Period and Deadlines proposed order submitted (Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC's Joinder in Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay all Filing Periods and Deadlines Pending the Adjudication of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim Under 18 U.S.C. 1961-1968, Objection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand with Supporting Memorandum) filed by Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC. (Tom, Robert) Updated which motion filing is in opposition to on 3/6/2018 (cbs).
March 5, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Withdraw the Federal RICO Claim and Remand Plaintiff's State Law Claims to Part II of Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee proposed order submitted (Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC's Joinder in Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim Under 18 U.S.C. 1961-1968, Objection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand with Supporting Memorandum) filed by Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC. (Tom, Robert)
March 5, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Stay All Filing Period and Deadlines Pending the Adjudication of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim Under 18 U.S.C. Sections 1961-1968, Ojbection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand With Supporting Memoran (Removing Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay all Filing Periods and Deadlines Pending the Adjudication of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim under 18 U.S.C 1961-1968, Objection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand with Supporting Memorandum) filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Tom, Robert)
March 5, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Withdraw the Federal RICO Claim and Remand Plaintiff's State Law Claims to Part II of Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee proposed order submitted (Removing Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim Under 18 U.S.C 1961-1968, Objection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand with Supporting Memorandum) filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Response in Opposition)(Tom, Robert)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting DE #22 Motion to Dismiss Defendants PNC BANK and MIDLAND LOAN SERVICES, INC. signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/27/18. (Fowlkes, J.)
February 27, 2018 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants PNC Bank National Association and Midland Loan Services, Inc. proposed order submitted by Olymbec USA LLC. (Kahane, S)
February 22, 2018 Filing 21 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager.(pyb)
February 21, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Consents to Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tom, Robert)
February 20, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Eightfold Real Estate Capital, L.P. for Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC.. (Tom, Robert)
February 20, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum)(Tom, Robert)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting DE #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/20/18. (Fowlkes, J.)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting DE #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/20/18. (Fowlkes, J.)
February 19, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay All Filing Period and Deadlines Pending the Adjudication of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim Under 18 U.S.C. Sections 1961-1968, Ojbection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand With Supporting Memorandum proposed order submitted by Olymbec USA LLC. (Skertich, Ryan)
February 19, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Correction to #13 MOTION to Withdraw the Federal RICO Claim and Remand Plaintiff's State Law Claims to Part II of Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee proposed order submitted to correct signature of filer. (Skertich, Ryan)
February 19, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw the Federal RICO Claim and Remand Plaintiff's State Law Claims to Part II of Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee proposed order submitted by Olymbec USA LLC.
February 19, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Michael Skertich on behalf of Olymbec USA LLC (Skertich, Ryan)
February 14, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Midland Loan Services, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion and Supporting Memorandum for an Extension of Time within which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Olymbec's Second Amended Complaint (proposed Order to be submitted)) by Midland Loan Services, Inc.. (Kisber, Zachary)
February 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0651-2725356) by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing)(Mellott, Christopher)
February 12, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Commercial Mortgage Trust 2007-C6 for 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC; Corporate Parent CW Financial Services LLC for CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC.. (Tom, Robert)
February 12, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT (Affidavit of Victor Gutierrez) by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 to Affidavit)(Tom, Robert)
February 12, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION Request to transfer venue to the U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland (proposed Order to be submitted) by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 5 to the Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 6 to Memorandum, #4 Exhibit 7 to Memorandum, #5 Exhibit 8 to Memorandum, #6 Exhibit 9 to Memorandum, #7 Exhibit 10 to Memorandum)(Tom, Robert)
February 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss (Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint) by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit B to Memorandum, #4 Exhibit C to Memorandum, #5 Exhibit D to Memorandum, #6 Exhibit E to Memorandum, #7 Exhibit F to Memorandum)(Tom, Robert)
January 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
January 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
January 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez, CWCapital Asset Management LLC from Shelby County, Tennessee Chancery Court, case number CH-17-1425-1 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0651-2711995), filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez, CWCapital Asset Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Tom, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olymbec USA LLC v. CWFS Insight LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Members of Lenox Park B, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher R Mellott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWFS Insight LLC
Represented By: Christopher R Mellott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenox Park A, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Tageson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Gutierrez
Represented By: Christopher R Mellott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wodicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Golinsky
Represented By: Christopher R Mellott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Bank National Association, Citigroup Global Markets Realty Corp, Campmark Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWFS-REDS LLC
Represented By: Christopher R Mellott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R Mellott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R Mellott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Commercial Mortgage Trust 2007-C6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar P. Fisher
Represented By: Robert P Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenox Park B, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Pesin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher Auction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Robert P Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Members of Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Members of Lenox Park A,, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Members of 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Schrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWCapital Asset Management LLC
Represented By: Christopher R Mellott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Loan Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Donna Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olymbec USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?