Kihn v. Vavala
Plaintiff: SSgt Aaron M Kihn
Defendant: Carolyn N Vavala
Case Number: 8:2018cv02619
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Carolyn N Vavala.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Aaron M Kihn re #1 Complaint Proposed Summons (Renahan, William)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Aaron M Kihn re #1 Complaint (Renahan, William)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Aaron M Kihn was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Paula Xinis. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn N Vavala ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7522136.), filed by Aaron M Kihn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Renahan, William) Modified on 10/1/2018 (heps, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kihn v. Vavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn N Vavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSgt Aaron M Kihn
Represented By: William Francis Renahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?