Mills v. Tyson et al

Plaintiff: Dade Mills and Wade Mills
Defendant: Patuxent Institution and Officer Tyson
Case Number: 8:2018cv02792
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Judith Lane Weber on behalf of Patuxent Institution (Lane Weber, Stephanie)
October 19, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Wade Mills ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/18/2018. (c/m&e as directed 10/19/18 sp2, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter) (sp2, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 10/19/2018 (sp2, Deputy Clerk).
September 18, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER directing the Finance Officer to file an Inmate Account Summary Information Sheet and Certificate within 21 days; directing the Clerk to Amend the docket. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/18/2018. (c/m 8/18/18 sp2, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wade Mills (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Patuxent Institution, Tyson, filed by Wade Mills. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Tyson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patuxent Institution
Represented By: Stephanie Judith Lane Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dade Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?