Kang et al v. Chas et al

Plaintiff: KS Kang, Inc., Kyung H Kang and KS Kang Inc.
Defendant: Charles S. Chas and In Sook Chas
Case Number: 8:2018cv02889
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KS Kang Inc., Kyung H Kang. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caruso, Aaron)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by KS Kang Inc., Kyung H Kang (Caruso, Aaron)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Robert Caruso on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caruso, Aaron)
September 30, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Charles S. Chas, In Sook Chas (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Victory, James)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/19/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Charles S. Chas, In Sook Chas (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Defendants' Disclosure of Corporate Interest)(Victory, James)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule Defendants' Statement Pursuant to Standing Order Concerning Removal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Defendants' Statement Pursuant to Standing Order Concerning Removal)(Victory, James)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL18-23082. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7566176), filed by In Sook Chas, Charles S. Chas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Docket Sheet)(Victory, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kang et al v. Chas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles S. Chas
Represented By: James Y Victory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In Sook Chas
Represented By: James Y Victory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KS Kang, Inc.
Represented By: Robinson S Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyung H Kang
Represented By: Robinson S Rowe
Represented By: Aaron Robert Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KS Kang Inc.
Represented By: Robinson S Rowe
Represented By: Aaron Robert Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?