Great Northern Insurance Company et al v. Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Plaintiff: XL Specialty Insurance Company and Great Northern Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
3Rd Party Defendant: Artex, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02934
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #21 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company, Great Northern Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/5/2018. (ats, Chambers)
November 2, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Great Northern Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company(Stravitz, Eric)
October 25, 2018 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Cappo. Directing attorney Michael Cappo to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/25/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Cappo (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7632263.) by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP(Silverman, Cary)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Order Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/5/2019.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/18/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call on November 13, 2018 AT 3:00pM AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/18/2018. (ats, Chambers)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Wendy Lindstrom. Directing attorney Wendy Lindstrom to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/17/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Wendy J. Lindstrom (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7617248.) by XL Specialty Insurance Company(Stravitz, Eric)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Hanoch Sheps. Directing attorney Hanoch Sheps to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Artex, Inc., filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract)(Silverman, Cary)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hanoch Sheps (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7608469.) by XL Specialty Insurance Company(Stravitz, Eric)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael O'Donnell. Directing attorney Michael O'Donnell to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/10/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael D. O'Donnell (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7599909.) by Great Northern Insurance Company(Stravitz, Eric)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Great Northern Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for Great Northern Insurance Company.(Stravitz, Eric)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by XL Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd. for XL Specialty Insurance Company.(Stravitz, Eric)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP.(Silverman, Cary)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Correspondence re: Removal Statement (Silverman, Cary)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/24/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/24/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International PLC, Other Affiliate Tyco Fire & Security (US) Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Simplex Time Recorder LLC, Other Affiliate SimplexGrinnell Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Tyco International Management Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Tyco Fire & Security USA Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Tyco Fire Protection LLC, Other Affiliate Master Protection, LP, Other Affiliate STR Grinnell GP Holding LLC for Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP.(Silverman, Cary)
September 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince Georgia's County, Maryland, case number CAL18-25065. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7575217), filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Complaint, #4 Attachment Information Report, #5 Attachment Line for Copies, #6 Attachment Dismissal, #7 Attachment Affidavit of Service)(Silverman, Cary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company et al v. Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Represented By: Cary Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric N Stravitz
Represented By: Wendy J Lindstrom
Represented By: Hanoch Sheps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric N Stravitz
Represented By: Michael D O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Artex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?