Potter et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kevin Potter and Colonel Marcia Potter
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 8:2018cv02961
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Potter, Colonel Marcia Potter. United States Of America served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Protil, Karl)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Potter, Colonel Marcia Potter. United States Of America served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Protil, Karl)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/26/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Supplemental to Complaint re: proposed Summonses (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Protil, Karl)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7580834.), filed by Kevin Potter, Colonel Marcia Potter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Protil, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potter et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Potter
Represented By: Karl J Protil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colonel Marcia Potter
Represented By: Karl J Protil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?