United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al

Plaintiff: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation and Lockheed Martin Enterprise Operations
Case Number: 8:2018cv02976
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Lockheed Martin Corporation waiver sent on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018; Lockheed Martin Enterprise Operations waiver sent on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018.(Isenhart, Jessi)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Lockheed Martin Corporation and Lockheed Martin Enterprise Operations. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Enterprise Operations, filed by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Lockheed Martin Corporation, #3 Summons to Lockheed Martin Enterprise Operations)(Isenhart, Jessi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Enterprise Operations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Jessi D Isenhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?