24-7 Bright Star Healthcare LLC v. Bright Star Nursing Services LLC

Plaintiff: 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare LLC
Defendant: Bright Star Nursing Services LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv02992
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare LLC. Bright Star Nursing Services LLC served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Attachment)(Caiola, Paul)
October 1, 2018 7 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service and Notice of Filing)(Caiola, Paul)
September 28, 2018 6 Featured Case LETTER ORDER regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/28/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2018 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bright Star Nursing Services LLC. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2018 Deficiency Notice as to 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare LLC -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 10/5/2018 (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2018 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare LLC (Caiola, Paul)
September 27, 2018 3 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare LLC identifying Corporate Parent BrightStar Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BrightStar Franchising, LLC, Other Affiliate BrightStar Technology Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Shelly Sun for 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare LLC.(Caiola, Paul) Modified on 9/28/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
September 27, 2018 2 NOTICE by 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare LLC For the clerk to issue summons. (Caiola, Paul)
September 27, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Bright Star Nursing Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7585818.), filed by 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Caiola, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare LLC v. Bright Star Nursing Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 24-7 Bright Star Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Paul Stephen Caiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright Star Nursing Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?