Fenwick et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Fenwick Stakeholder, Regina Fenwick and Edward Fenwick
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II and Jessica Toye
Case Number: 8:2018cv03065
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #11 Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (until thirty 30 days after the Court has ruled on the Motion to Consolidate Related Cases. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/19/2018. (rass, Chambers)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Alex M. Azar, II.(Marquardt, Sarah)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Alex M. Azar, II of Related Case (Marquardt, Sarah)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 Removal Notification Letter (c/m 10/10/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/10/2018. (c/m 10/10/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Alex M. Azar, II (Attachments: #1 Exh. 1 continued_Case Summary, #2 Exh. 1 continued_Complaint Forwarded to Circuit Court judges initials (CHC), #3 Exh. 1 continued_Complaint (PII redactions), #4 Exh. 1 continued_Writ of Summons (Alex Azar II), #5 Exh. 1 continued_Writ of Summons (Edward Fenwick), #6 Exh. 1 continued_Writ of Summons (Regina Fenwick), #7 Exh. 1 continued_Writ of Summons (Edward Fenwick) stamp signatures, #8 Exh. 1 continued_Writ of Summons (Regina Fenwick) stamp signatures, #9 Exh. 1 continued_Notice of Docketing Appeal (Jessica Toye), #10 Exh. 1 continued_Cedar Point FCU re correct address letter, #11 Exh. 1 continued_Notice of Contemplated Dismissal (lack of Jurisdiction))(Marquardt, Sarah)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Alex M. Azar, II was filed incorrectly. **Each attachment must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. File any pending motions as separate docket entries. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Local Rule FILING OF REMAINING STATE COURT PAPERS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 103.5(Marquardt, Sarah)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/5/2018. (rass, Chambers)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time by Alex M. Azar, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marquardt, Sarah)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5(Marquardt, Sarah)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cicuit Court for Saint Mary's County, case number C-18-CV-18-000275., filed by Alex M. Azar, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 1 (continued), #5 Exhibit 1 (continued), #6 Exhibit 1 (continued), #7 Exhibit 1 (continued), #8 Exhibit 1 (continued), #9 Exhibit 1 (continued), #10 Exhibit 1 (continued), #11 Exhibit 1 (continued), #12 Exhibit 1 (continued), #13 Exhibit 1 (continued), #14 Exhibit 1 (continued))(Marquardt, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fenwick et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Sarah A Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Toye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fenwick Stakeholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Fenwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Fenwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?