Johnson v. Foxwell et al

Petitioner: Julian Andrew Johnson
Respondent: Ricky Foxwell and Maryland Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2018cv03109
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Julian Andrew Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER directing Respondents to file an Answer to #1 Petition on or before 40 days from the date of this order; directing that Johnson may reply within 30 days after service of Respondents' answer. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/30/2018. (c/m as directed 10/31/18 nu, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2018 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14637109772 (nu, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Julian Andrew Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Foxwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julian Andrew Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ricky Foxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maryland Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?