Reinhardt v. Graham et al

Plaintiff: David Allen Reinhardt
Defendant: Warden Richard Graham, Jr., Mr. Weber and Lt. Butler
Interested Party: Office of the Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2018cv03121
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by David Allen Reinhardt (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #2 Order and Institutional Coordinator Letter filed by David Allen Reinhardt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the Plaintiff 28 days to file a reply. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/7/2018. (c/m 11/8/18 sp2, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #2 Order and Institutional Coordinator Letter Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Office of the Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Michael Yates with Attachments)(Lane Weber, Stephanie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Judith Lane Weber on behalf of Office of the Attorney General (Lane Weber, Stephanie)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/15/2018. (c/m&e as directed 10/15/18 sp2, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/15/2018 (sp2, Deputy Clerk).
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Butler, Richard Graham, Jr, Weber (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by David Allen Reinhardt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/12/2018 (sp2, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reinhardt v. Graham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Richard Graham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of the Attorney General
Represented By: Stephanie Judith Lane Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?