Ruggieri v. Piontkwoski

Plaintiff: James Angelo Ruggieri
Defendant: Paul K. Piontkwoski
Case Number: 8:2018cv03166
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 11 Consent MOTION to Remand by Paul K. Piontkwoski(Murphy, John)
November 8, 2018 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul K. Piontkwoski, filed by James Angelo Ruggieri. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Comparison Copy of Complaint)(Wiesenfeld, Paul)
October 15, 2018 9 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal Defendant's Statement in Response to Standing Order filed by Paul K. Piontkwoski.(Murphy, John)
October 15, 2018 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Paul K. Piontkwoski (Murphy, John)
October 12, 2018 7 NOTICE by Paul K. Piontkwoski re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Murphy, John)
October 12, 2018 6 NOTICE by Paul K. Piontkwoski re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Murphy, John)
October 12, 2018 5 Featured Case Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/12/2018. (c/m 10/12/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 4 Removal Notification Letter for Attorney Paul R Wiesenfeld (c/m 10/12/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Paul K. Piontkwoski was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to #1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 2 MOTION for Disclosure , MOTION for Discovery , MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Paul K. Piontkwoski (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Murphy, John)
October 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL18-32500. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7611924), filed by Paul K. Piontkwoski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Writ of Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Circuit Court Notice of Removal)(Murphy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruggieri v. Piontkwoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul K. Piontkwoski
Represented By: John J Murphy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Angelo Ruggieri
Represented By: Paul R Wiesenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?