Hill v. Sturgis et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Hill, Jr.
Defendant: Mark Summerville, Anthony Johnson, Captain Barnes, C.O. Sturgis, Dayena Corcoran, David Gills, Nurse Nicole Frey, C.O. Collins, C.O. M. Parsons and Warden Foxwell Ricky
Case Number: 8:2018cv03185
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Judith Lane Weber on behalf of Captain Barnes, C.O. Collins, C.O. M. Parsons, C.O. Sturgis (Lane Weber, Stephanie)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 Correspondence re accepting service on behalf of C.O. Sturgis, Captain Barnes, C.O. Collins, C.O. M. Parsons and Foxwell Ricky and refusing service on behalf Nicole Frey, Anthony Johnson, Mark Summerville, Dayena Corcoran, David Gills (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Judith Lane Weber on behalf of Dayena Corcoran, Foxwell Ricky (Lane Weber, Stephanie)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Ronald Hill, Jr. ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter) (c/m&e 11/2/18 sp2, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Finance Officer to file an Inmate Account Summary Information Report and Certificate within 21 days. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/17/2018. (c/m 10/17/18 sp2, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Hill, Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Captain Barnes, C.O. Collins, Dayena Corcoran, Nicole Frey, David Gills, Anthony Johnson, C.O. M. Parsons, Foxwell Ricky, C.O. Sturgis, Mark Summerville, filed by Ronald Hill, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sp2, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Sturgis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Summerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Barnes
Represented By: Stephanie Judith Lane Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Sturgis
Represented By: Stephanie Judith Lane Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayena Corcoran
Represented By: Stephanie Judith Lane Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Nicole Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Collins
Represented By: Stephanie Judith Lane Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. M. Parsons
Represented By: Stephanie Judith Lane Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Foxwell Ricky
Represented By: Stephanie Judith Lane Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?