Newby v. Younger et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Newby
Defendant: Officer Farmer D. W., Captain Riffey and Officer C. Younger
Case Number: 8:2018cv03207
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; DISMISSING without prejudice #1 the Complaint; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/6/2018. (c/m 11/7/18 nu, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/6/2018. (c/m 11/7/18 nu, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/18/2018. (c/m 10/19/18 nu, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio Newby (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C. Younger, Riffey, Farmer D. W., filed by Antonio Newby. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newby v. Younger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Farmer D. W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Riffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer C. Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?