Phelps et al v. Pepperidge Farm, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kevin Taney, Gregory Phelps and Randolph Latimer
Defendant: Pepperidge Farm, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv03313
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1715
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE CALL on January 3, 2019 at 10:30AM AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/21/2018. (ats, Chambers)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Fernandez, Anthony)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sari Alamuddin. Directing attorney Sari Alamuddin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/30/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Paul Evans. Directing attorney Paul Evans to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/30/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Benjamin Jacobs. Directing attorney Benjamin Jacobs to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/30/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sari M. Alamuddin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7693656.) by Pepperidge Farm, Inc.(Bisbee, Lincoln)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul Evans (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7693637.) by Pepperidge Farm, Inc.(Bisbee, Lincoln)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin K. Jacobs (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7693560.) by Pepperidge Farm, Inc.(Bisbee, Lincoln)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Randolph Latimer, Gregory Phelps, Kevin Taney by Pepperidge Farm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Taney Consignment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Latimer Consignment Agreement)(Bisbee, Lincoln)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pepperidge Farm, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Campbell Soup Company, Corporate Parent Campbell Investment Company for Pepperidge Farm, Inc..(Bisbee, Lincoln)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lincoln Owens Bisbee on behalf of Pepperidge Farm, Inc. (Bisbee, Lincoln)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Phelps, Randolph Latimer, Kevin Taney. Pepperidge Farm, Inc. served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018.(Fernandez, Anthony)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Randolph Latimer, Gregory Phelps, Kevin Taney was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Info. Sheet, Class Action Complaint served on CT Corporation System on 10/30/2018, filed by Randolph Latimer, Gregory Phelps, Kevin Taney.(Fernandez, Anthony) Modified on 11/2/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Pepperidge Farm, Inc.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/26/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7639019.), filed by Gregory Phelps, Randolph Latimer, Kevin Taney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fernandez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phelps et al v. Pepperidge Farm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Taney
Represented By: Anthony S Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Phelps
Represented By: Anthony S Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Latimer
Represented By: Anthony S Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepperidge Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C Evans
Represented By: Lincoln Owens Bisbee
Represented By: Sari M Alamuddin
Represented By: Benjamin K Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?