Levitt v. Commissioner, Social Security

Plaintiff: Barbara S Levitt
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2018cv03465
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
0 Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
1 Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara S Levitt. Commissioner, Social Security served on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 6 Summons Issued 60 days as to Commissioner, Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (c/m 11/19/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerk to correct and issue summonses to the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/19/2018. (c/m 11/19/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2018 3 Featured Case Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/14/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 4 NOTICE of Summonses by Barbara S Levitt (Attachments: #1 Summons) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 2 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Commissioner (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637033361.), filed by Barbara S Levitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix of Attachments, #3 Attachment 1, #4 Attachment 2, #5 Attachment 3, #6 Attachment 4, #7 Attachment 5, #8 Attachment 6, #9 Attachment 7, #10 Attachment 8, #11 Attachment 9, #12 Attachment 10, #13 Attachment 11, #14 Attachment 12, #15 Attachment 13, #16 Attachment 14, #17 Attachment 15) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levitt v. Commissioner, Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara S Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?