Srisatta v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Jonathan B. Srisatta
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2018cv03469
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
0 Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
1 Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan B. Srisatta. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019.(Nicoll, William)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued 60 days as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 11/14/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/13/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Consent to Magistrate Judge (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan B. Srisatta (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Jonathan B. Srisatta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2018: #3 Proposed Summons) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Srisatta v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan B. Srisatta
Represented By: William James Nicoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?