India Globalization Capital, Inc. v. Bricoleur Partners, L.P.

Plaintiff: India Globalization Capital, Inc.
Defendant: Bricoleur Partners, L.P.
Case Number: 8:2018cv03474
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving #5 Notice of Dismissal.; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/27/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by India Globalization Capital, Inc. (Feinberg, Matthew)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by India Globalization Capital, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate IGC - Mauritius, Other Affiliate Techni Bharathi Private Limited, Other Affiliate India Mining and Trading Private Limited, Other Affiliate IGC Logistic Private Limited, Other Affiliate IGC Enterprises Limited, Other Affiliate Cabaran Ultima Sdn. Bhd. for India Globalization Capital, Inc..(Feinberg, Matthew)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/19/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bricoleur Partners, L.P.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Bricoleur Partners, L.P. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7665745.), filed by India Globalization Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Proposed Summons)(Feinberg, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: India Globalization Capital, Inc. v. Bricoleur Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bricoleur Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: India Globalization Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Edward Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?