Cherryholmes et al v. Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kalyn Cherryholmes and Bryce Cherryholmes
Defendant: Jocelyn Idema, Thomas Monko and Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv03541
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/9/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2019 Filing 22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jocelyn Idema (Waldrep, Arren)
January 8, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT Joint Submission of All Parties on Trial Date by Bryce Cherryholmes, Kalyn Cherryholmes(Malone, Patrick)
January 7, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC (Gipe, Alicia)
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Thomas Monko (McKee, Gregory)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #12 Joint MOTION Modify Scheduling Order, Joint Status Report due 08/09/2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/4/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day for Mediation. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/4/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER. For the reasons stated during the January 4, 2019 Case Management Conference, it is ORDERED that the parties shall FILE a joint submission proposing trial dates by January 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/4/2019. (sl5s, Chambers)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 Case Management Conference held on 1/4/2019 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-Hibbs-2B) (jmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mark E Spellman. Directing attorney Mark E Spellman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/4/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark E. Spellman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7761558.) by Bryce Cherryholmes, Kalyn Cherryholmes(Malone, Patrick)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION Modify Scheduling Order by Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC, Jocelyn Idema, Thomas Monko (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waldrep, Arren)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/20/2018. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 Defendant Thomas Monko's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Thomas Monko.(McKee, Gregory)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia J. Gipe on behalf of Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC (Gipe, Alicia)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC.(Hale, Shadonna)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 Jocelyn Idema, DO ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jocelyn Idema.(McAfee, Larry)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to Thomas Monko.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Bryce Cherryholmes, Kalyn Cherryholmes re #1 Complaint, Proposed Summons as to Defendant Thomas Monko (Malone, Patrick)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC and Jocelyn Idema. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Bryce Cherryholmes and Kalyn Cherryholmes was filed with the following attachment missing - Proposed Summons as to Defendant Thomas Monko. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/19/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Bryce and Kalyn Cherryholmes against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7677529.), filed by Bryce Cherryholmes, Kalyn Cherryholmes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Malone, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherryholmes et al v. Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalyn Cherryholmes
Represented By: Patrick A Malone
Represented By: Mark E Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Cherryholmes
Represented By: Patrick A Malone
Represented By: Mark E Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Idema
Represented By: Larry D McAfee
Represented By: Arren Waldrep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Monko
Represented By: Arren Waldrep
Represented By: Gregory Samuel McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Advanced Orthopaedics, LLC
Represented By: Shadonna E Hale
Represented By: Arren Waldrep
Represented By: Alicia J. Gipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?